This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 04/06/2021 at 13:06:21 (UTC).

DAVILMAR CALIXTE, MISSELINE V CALIXTE, ULRICK

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 DAVILMAR CALIXTE, MISSELINE filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against CALIXTE, ULRICK. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHNSON , LAURA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JOHNSON , LAURA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

DAVILMAR CALIXTE , MISSELINE

Defendant and Respondent

CALIXTE , ULRICK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

GUERRIER , ROBERT WELLINGTON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • HearingDVHR - DVRV HEARING; Location:MB; Room:6C (Main Branch)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketCLERK'S MEMO OF DISPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketDISPOSED BY NON-JURY TRIAL; Notes:NJ - DISPOSED BY NON JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketATTY. FOR RESPONDENT: GUERRIER, ROBERT WELLINGTON; Notes:ATTY. FOR RESPONDENT: GUERRIER, ROBERT WELLINGTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 32279 PAGE 1735-1745; Notes:FJ IN EFFECT UNTIL 3/10/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketE-FILED DUPLICATE FILING; Notes:DE 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:SERVED ON ULRICK CALIXTE ON 3/8/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes:FOR SERVICE OF PLEADINGS BY ELECTRONIC MAIL - F/B ATTY GUERRIER OBO RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:F/B ATTY GUERRIER OBO RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketORDER OF TEMP INJ/DOM VIOLENCE; Notes:HEARING SET MARCH 10, 2021 AT 9AM RM 6C, 205 NORTH DIXIE HWY WEST PALM BEACH FL 33401 SIGNED BY R FRANCIS DATED 030221

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketSHERIFF'S OFFICE INFO SHEET; Notes:RESP DESCRIPTION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketINFORMATION SHEET ADDITIONAL INFORMATION; Notes:ADDITIONAL INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT UCC JURIS ACT; Notes:AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT FB PLTF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCIVIL DATE OF BIRTH; Notes:FB PLTF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE FORM; Notes:FB PLTF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:FB PLTF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR INJUNCTION; Notes:FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE FB PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketSET FOR DVHR - DVRV HEARING 3/10/2021 9:30 AM JOHNSON, JUDGELAURA; Notes:DVHR - DVRV HEARING 3/10/2021 9:30 AM JOHNSON, JUDGELAURA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:FD: Family Central - FD (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GUERRIER , ROBERT WELLINGTON