This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/28/2023 at 15:39:38 (UTC).

D.A.N. JOINT VENTURE III L.P. V REILLY, LAWRENCE P

Case Summary

On 04/19/2022 D A N JOINT VENTURE III L P filed an Other lawsuit against REILLY, LAWRENCE P. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SHERMAN , JAMES W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SHERMAN , JAMES W

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

D.A.N. JOINT VENTURE III L.P.

Defendant and Respondent

REILLY , LAWRENCE P

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

STORFER , RICHARD B

 

Court Documents

ORDER EXTENDING TIME

12/29/2022:ORDER EXTENDING TIME

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

12/27/2022:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

12/13/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4703006

12/07/2022:PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4703006

ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

12/06/2022:ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

12/02/2022:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

ORDER PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PERFECT SERVICE OF PROCESS JUDGE SHERMAN ON 12/1/22

12/01/2022:ORDER PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PERFECT SERVICE OF PROCESS JUDGE SHERMAN ON 12/1/22

MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT & FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PERFECT SERVICE OF PROCESS F/B PLT

11/22/2022:MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT & FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PERFECT SERVICE OF PROCESS F/B PLT

NOTICE OF HEARING

11/22/2022:NOTICE OF HEARING

ORDER FINDING GOOD CAUSE

10/26/2022:ORDER FINDING GOOD CAUSE

GOOD CAUSE MOT,NOT,JUD-DISMISS

09/27/2022:GOOD CAUSE MOT,NOT,JUD-DISMISS

NOTICE OF HEARING

09/27/2022:NOTICE OF HEARING

RETURNED MAIL

09/22/2022:RETURNED MAIL

ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

09/13/2022:ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4610297

09/13/2022:PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4610297

ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DIRECTING PROPER SERVICE JUDGE SHERMAN ON 9/9/22

09/09/2022:ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DIRECTING PROPER SERVICE JUDGE SHERMAN ON 9/9/22

~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED ADA LANGUAGE REQUIRED TO PROCESS PURSUANT TO AO 2.207

09/09/2022:~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED ADA LANGUAGE REQUIRED TO PROCESS PURSUANT TO AO 2.207

COMPLAINT

09/09/2022:COMPLAINT

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER EXTENDING TIME; Notes: FOR PLT TO FILE AFF OF COMPLIANCE AND RETURN RECEIPT -JUDGE SHERMAN DTD 12/29/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Notes: TO FILE AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE & RETURN RECEIPT IN ACCORDANCE WITH FLA STAT 48.161 F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED LAWRENCE P. REILLY - 12/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4703006; Receipt Amount: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $330.00; total Amount Paid: $330.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 12/07/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4703006; Notes: $10.00 4703006 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: RSTORFER@LORIUMLAW.COM;R1SERVICE@LORIUMLAW.COM AS TO DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED; Notes: RETURN OF NON-SERVICE LAWRENCE P. REILLY LAURENCE P. REILLY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PERFECT SERVICE OF PROCESS JUDGE SHERMAN ON 12/1/22; Notes: PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PERFECT SERVICE OF PROCESS JUDGE SHERMAN ON 12/1/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: LAWRENCE P. REILLY - SUBSTITUTE SERVED JANE DOE, DAUGHTER 05/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4432521; Receipt Amount: $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 04/20/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 04/20/2022; Description: 400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due: $300.00; Amount Paid: $300.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: rstorfer@loriumlaw.com;lmcrae@loriumlaw.com;sfallas@loriumlaw.com AS TO DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4432521; Notes: $310.00 4432521 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RF: County Civil Central - RF (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED COUNTY AND NOT CIRCUIT-A CASE MANAGEMENT STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED TO THIS SUMMONS OR FILED IN THE SAME FILING PER A.O. 3.107 PAGES 10 & 11. THANK YOU; Notes: rstorfer@loriumlaw.com;lmcrae@loriumlaw.com;sfallas@loriumlaw.com COUNTY AND NOT CIRCUIT-A CASE MANAGEMENT STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED TO THIS SUMMONS OR FILED IN THE SAME FILING PER A.O. 3.107 PAGES 10 & 11. THANK YOU

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less