This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 03/30/2022 at 19:13:46 (UTC).

CYPRESS CREEK MRI, LLC. A/A/O TASHANIA WINNIE V SAFETY SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/28/2022 CYPRESS CREEK MRI, LLC A/A/O TASHANIA WINNIE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SAFETY SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CORLEW , REGINALD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CORLEW , REGINALD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CYPRESS CREEK MRI, LLC. A/A/O TASHANIA WINNIE

Defendant and Respondent

SAFETY SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

FISCHETTI , MICHAEL J

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/28/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

02/28/2022:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS REQUESTED

02/28/2022:SUMMONS REQUESTED

PAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4368752

03/02/2022:PAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4368752

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/02/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

03/07/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

03/15/2022:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2022
  • HearingCANCELLED - SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location:SB; Room:ZOOM PIP Pre-Trial (South Branch)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketCancelled SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP on 4/12/2022 9:30:00 AM due to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketDISMISSED BEFORE HEARING; Notes:DB - DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Notes:WITHOUT PREJUDICE F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED SAFETY SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY - 03/07/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4368752; Receipt Amount: $65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$65.00; total Amount Paid:$65.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • FinancialDue Date:03/02/2022; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • FinancialDue Date:03/02/2022; Description:403FF County Civil Claim < $100; Amount Due:$55.00; Amount Paid:$55.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:MFPAESQ@GMAIL.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 4/12/2022 9:30 AM CORLEW, REGINALD; Notes:SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 4/12/2022 9:30 AM CORLEW, REGINALD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4368752; Notes:$65.00 4368752 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RD: South Branch County Civil Division - RD (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CYPRESS CREEK MRI, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SAFETY SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fischetti, Michael James