This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/13/2023 at 19:05:19 (UTC).

CT INDIGO PALMS LLC V GARCIA, MANUEL ENRIQUE

Case Summary

On 02/01/2023 CT INDIGO PALMS LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GARCIA, MANUEL ENRIQUE. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CASTOR , FRANK S. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CASTOR , FRANK S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CT INDIGO PALMS LLC

Defendant and Respondent

GARCIA , MANUEL ENRIQUE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

KELLEY , JERRON

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/01/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

02/01/2023:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/01/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4764408

02/02/2023:PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4764408

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/08/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

02/09/2023:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

02/10/2023:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

02/10/2023:MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

02/10/2023:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

CLERK'S DEFAULT

02/14/2023:CLERK'S DEFAULT

FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 34127 PAGE 1205-1205

02/15/2023:FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 34127 PAGE 1205-1205

STIPULATION

03/01/2023:STIPULATION

MOTION TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT F/B PLT

03/01/2023:MOTION TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT F/B PLT

ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 34156 PAGE 1683-1683

03/01/2023:ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 34156 PAGE 1683-1683

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 34156 PAGE 1683-1683; Notes: APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT: CLOSING CASE: AND DISBURSEMENT OF FUNDS FROM REGISTRY JUDGE CASTOR ON 3/1/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT F/B PLT; Notes: TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION; Notes: JOINT STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT F/B PLT AND DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketDISPOSED BY DEFAULT; Notes: DD - DISPOSED BY DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 34127 PAGE 1205-1205; Notes: AS TO COUNT I ONLY FOR POSSESSION - SIGNED JUDGE CASTOR 2/15/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S DEFAULT; Notes: ESERVICE@KELLEYGRANTLAW.COM MANUEL ENRIQUE GARCIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT; Notes: CLERKS AS TO MANUEL ENRIQUE GARCIA F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT; Notes: AS TO MANUEL ENRIQUE GARCIA F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Notes: MANUEL ENRIQUE GARCIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED MANUEL ENRIQUE GARCIA - 02/02/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4764408; Receipt Amount: $195.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $195.00; total Amount Paid: $195.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 02/02/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 02/02/2023; Description: 401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4764408; Notes: $195.00 4764408 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RB: County Civil Central - RB (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: eservice@kelleygrantlaw.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less