This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 08/02/2019 at 15:15:06 (UTC).

CROSBY, PATRICIA B V SANCHEZ, SANTIAGO

Case Summary

On 06/28/2019 CROSBY, PATRICIA B filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against SANCHEZ, SANTIAGO. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, West County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLLINS , SHERRI L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-WB

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLLINS , SHERRI L

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

CROSBY , PATRICIA B

Defendant and Respondent

SANCHEZ , SANTIAGO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

GUERRIER , ROBERT WELLINGTON

 

Court Documents

ORDER SETTING HEARING

07/25/2019:ORDER SETTING HEARING

MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY F/B DEFT

07/16/2019:MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY F/B DEFT

MOTION TO DISMISS

07/15/2019:MOTION TO DISMISS

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

07/12/2019:NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

07/12/2019:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

07/12/2019:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

07/03/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

06/28/2019:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

06/28/2019:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/28/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

06/28/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/28/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 3228550

06/28/2019:PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 3228550

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER SETTING HEARING; Notes:DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS MEDIATION AND ORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING ON POSSESSION AND GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY - 8/16/19@ 1:30PM- JUDGE COLLINS DTD 7/25/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY F/B DEFT; Notes:TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY F/B DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO DISMISS; Notes:THE COMPLAINT FILED BY PLT F/B DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY; Notes:F/B DFTS ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes:F/B R GUERRIER OBO DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:F/B R GUERRIER OBO DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:AS TO SANTIAGO SANCHEZ SERVED ON 07/02/2019 VIA POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT; Notes:AS TO DFT. F/B PLT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Notes:F/B PLT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:F/B PLT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 3228550; Notes:$195.00 3228550 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RA: West Branch Cty Civ, SC, Evictions - RA (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Receipt Number:3228550; Receipt Amount: $195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$195.00; total Amount Paid:$195.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Due Date:06/28/2019; Description:Summons $10.00; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Due Date:06/28/2019; Description:401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due:$185.00; Amount Paid:$185.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GUERRIER , ROBERT WELLINGTON