This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/11/2023 at 15:14:03 (UTC).

CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS, INC. V RODRIGUEZ, VIRGILIO

Case Summary

On 01/30/2023 CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RODRIGUEZ, VIRGILIO. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TEW , STEPHANIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TEW , STEPHANIE

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS, INC.

Defendant and Respondent

RODRIGUEZ , VIRGILIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

BLACHER , JEFFREY W

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/30/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/30/2023:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

01/30/2023:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

SUMMONS REQUESTED

01/30/2023:SUMMONS REQUESTED

PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4762310

01/31/2023:PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4762310

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/01/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/09/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

03/02/2023:HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

ORDER SETTING HEARING

03/03/2023:ORDER SETTING HEARING

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING; Notes: CASE MGMT CONFERENCE APRIL 3 2023 @ 3PM VIA ZOOM -JUDGE TEW 3/03/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • HearingSCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location: MB; Room: 6J (Main Branch); Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL; Notes: BOTH PARTIES APPEARED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: SERVED VIRGILIO RODRIGUEZ - 02/08/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: LEGALPLEADINGS@POLLACKROSEN.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4762310; Receipt Amount: $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $310.00; total Amount Paid: $310.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/31/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/31/2023; Description: 400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due: $300.00; Amount Paid: $300.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 3/2/2023 2:15 PM TEW, STEPHANIE; Notes: SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 3/2/2023 2:15 PM TEW, STEPHANIE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4762310; Notes: $310.00 4762310 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RJ: County Civil Central - RJ (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less