*********************X-MB
01/30/2023
Pending - Other Pending
Small Claim - Other Small Claim
Palm Beach, Florida
CASTOR , FRANK S
CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS, INC.
FEREIRA , LUIS
BLACHER , JEFFREY W
JACOBS , CHRISTOPHER J
01/30/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET
01/30/2023:STATEMENT OF CLAIM
01/30/2023:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION
01/30/2023:SUMMONS REQUESTED
01/31/2023:PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4762369
02/01/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED
02/09/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)
03/07/2023:HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL
03/07/2023:ORDER RESETTING
04/12/2023:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL
HearingSCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location: MB; Room: 4C (Main Branch); Notes
[-] Read LessDocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: F/B CHRISTOPHER J JACOBS OBO DFT
[-] Read LessHearingSCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location: MB; Room: 4C (Main Branch); Notes
[-] Read LessDocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 4/18/2023 9:00 AM CASTOR, FRANK S; Notes: SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 4/18/2023 9:00 AM CASTOR, FRANK S
[-] Read LessDocketORDER RESETTING; Notes: PTC MEDIATION APRIL 18 2023 @ 9AM -JUDGE CASTOR 3/07/23
[-] Read LessDocketHEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL; Notes: PARTIES PRESENT
[-] Read LessDocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE SUBSTITUTE LUIS FEREIRA - 02/08/2023
[-] Read LessDocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: LEGALPLEADINGS@POLLACKROSEN.COM
[-] Read LessFinancialReceipt Number: 4762369; Receipt Amount: $310.00
[-] Read LessFinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $310.00; total Amount Paid: $310.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00
[-] Read LessFinancialDue Date: 01/31/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00
[-] Read LessFinancialDue Date: 01/31/2023; Description: 400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due: $300.00; Amount Paid: $300.00; Amount Balance: $0.00
[-] Read LessDocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 3/7/2023 9:00 AM CASTOR, FRANK S; Notes: SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 3/7/2023 9:00 AM CASTOR, FRANK S
[-] Read LessDocketPAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4762369; Notes: $310.00 4762369 Fully Paid
[-] Read LessDocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RB: County Civil Central - RB (Civil)
[-] Read LessDocketSUMMONS REQUESTED; Notes
[-] Read LessDocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes
[-] Read LessDocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes
[-] Read LessDocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes
[-] Read Less