This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/12/2023 at 19:04:02 (UTC).

CPI ROYAL MANOR, L.L.C. V ESPIDOL, CAROLE A

Case Summary

On 01/31/2023 CPI ROYAL MANOR, L L C filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ESPIDOL, CAROLE A. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CORLEW , REGINALD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CORLEW , REGINALD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CPI ROYAL MANOR, L.L.C.

Defendant and Respondent

ESPIDOL , CAROLE A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

ARBEITER , SHAWN D

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/31/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

01/31/2023:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4762991

02/01/2023:PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4762991

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/01/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4763364

02/01/2023:PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4763364

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

02/07/2023:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

02/28/2023:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/28/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

02/28/2023:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

CLERK'S DEFAULT

03/03/2023:CLERK'S DEFAULT

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

03/03/2023:MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

03/06/2023:CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 34164 PAGE 842-842

03/06/2023:DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 34164 PAGE 842-842

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketDISPOSED BY DEFAULT; Notes: DD - DISPOSED BY DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 34164 PAGE 842-842; Notes: JUDGE CORLEW ON 3/6/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE; Notes: OF FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR MOBILE HOME TENANT EVICTION F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Notes: DEFAULT FOR MOBILE HOME TENANT EVICTION F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S DEFAULT; Notes: SARBEITER@LAWHMA.COM TO CAROLE A. ESPIDOL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT; Notes: CLERKS AS TO CAROLE A ESPIDOL F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: CAROLE A ESPIDOL SERVED 2/3/23 POSTING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT; Notes: AS TO CAROLE ESPIDOL F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Notes: CAROLE A ESPIDOL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4763364; Receipt Amount: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4762991; Receipt Amount: $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $195.00; total Amount Paid: $195.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 02/01/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 02/01/2023; Description: 401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4763364; Notes: $10.00 4763364 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: sarbeiter@lawhma.com;lphelps@lawhma.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4762991; Notes: $185.00 4762991 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RD: South Branch County Civil Division - RD (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Notes: MOBILE HOME F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less