This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 03/01/2022 at 14:40:33 (UTC).

COTLER, ROBIN V COTLER, TERRY

Case Summary

On 04/13/2021 COTLER, ROBIN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against COTLER, TERRY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHNSON , LAURA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JOHNSON , LAURA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

COTLER , ROBIN

Defendant and Respondent

COTLER , TERRY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MCNAMARA , KEVIN LEE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketDISPOSED BY JUDGE; Notes:DJ - DISPOSED BY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketATTY. FOR PETITIONER: MCNAMARA, KEVIN LEE; Notes:ATTY. FOR PETITIONER: MCNAMARA, KEVIN LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketFINAL JUD DISSOLVING MARRIAGE BOOK 32866 PAGE 1291-1295; Notes:DTD 09-08-21 JOHNSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketRE-NOTICE OF HEARING; Notes:RE-NOTICE OF FINAL HEARING 09/08/2021 08:45:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FINAL HEARING; Notes:NOTICE OF FINAL HEARING 08/24/2021 8:45 A.M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketAGREEMENT; Notes:NOTICE OF FILING MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3987058; Receipt Amount: $409.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$409.00; total Amount Paid:$409.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:04/14/2021; Description:700FF Family Dissolution of Marriage PB_070117PB; Amount Due:$409.00; Amount Paid:$409.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketPAID $409.00 ON RECEIPT 3987058; Notes:$409.00 3987058 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:FD: Family Central - FD (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENTS - F/B ATTY KEVIN MCNAMARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE FORM; Notes:F/B ATTY KEVIN MCNAMARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketSOC SEC NO FILED; Notes:F/B ATTY KEVIN MCNAMARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketPETITION; Notes:FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND OTHER RELIEF WITHOUT DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILDREN - F/B ATTY KEVIN MCNAMARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:F/B ATTY KEVIN MCNAMARA

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCNAMARA, KEVIN