This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 02/11/2019 at 17:34:45 (UTC).

CORWIN, FLORENCE

Case Summary

On 01/07/2019 CORWIN, FLORENCE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHOSBERG_FEUER , SAMANTHA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCHOSBERG_FEUER , SAMANTHA

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Not Classified By Court

CORWIN , BRUCE

HURST , ENID

Decedent

CORWIN , FLORENCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court Attorney

WILEN , BARRY ALAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2019
  • LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION BOOK 30382 PAGE 689-689; Notes:S/B J. SCHOSBERG-FEUER DTD 1/23/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • ORDER ADMITTING WILL; Notes:TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVES S/B J. SCHOSBERG-FEUER DTD 01/23/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • WILL BOOK 30381 PAGE 41-48; Notes:ORIGINAL DTD 09-16-96

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • DEATH CERTIFICATE; Notes:ORIGINAL FOR JACK L CORWIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • DEATH CERT PROBATE DECEDENT; Notes:ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 2985897; Notes:$401.00 2985897 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:IX: South Branch Probate - IX (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • WILL; Notes:EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • NON-TAX CERT/RCPT/AFFIDAVIT; Notes:F/B ENID HURST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • OATH; Notes:OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT AND ACCEPTANCE F/B ENID HURST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • OATH; Notes:OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT AND ACCEPTANCE F/B BRUCE CORWIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • PETITION; Notes:TO WAVE BOND OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE F/B ENID HURST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • PETITION; Notes:TO WAIVE BOND OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE F/B BRUCE CORWIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • DEATH CERTIFICATE; Notes:FOR JACK L CORWIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • DEATH CERT PROBATE DECEDENT; Notes:EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION; Notes:F/B ATTY WILEN OBO ENID HURST AND BRUCE CORWIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Receipt Number:2985897; Receipt Amount: $401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$401.00; total Amount Paid:$401.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Due Date:01/08/2019; Description:500FF Formal Administration; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less