This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 11/18/2019 at 15:01:58 (UTC).

CORNELL, PETER B V JULIANO, BETTY J

Case Summary

On 10/14/2019 CORNELL, PETER B filed an Other lawsuit against JULIANO, BETTY J. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, North County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CASTOR , FRANK S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-NB

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    North County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CASTOR , FRANK S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CORNELL , PETER B

Defendants and Respondents

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF HIGHWAY SAFETY AND MOTOR VEHICLES

JULIANO , VINCENT A

JULIANO , BETTY J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

PENNER , CHAD BARRETT

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

HUSKISSON , LORI A

NICOLETTI , PAUL J

 

Court Documents

AGREED ORDER ACCEPTING STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT - SIGNED JUDGE CASTOR 11/14/2019

11/15/2019:AGREED ORDER ACCEPTING STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT - SIGNED JUDGE CASTOR 11/14/2019

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

11/12/2019:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

AGREEMENT

11/08/2019:AGREEMENT

PAID $330.00 ON RECEIPT 3370203

10/16/2019:PAID $330.00 ON RECEIPT 3370203

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/14/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/14/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/14/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AGREED ORDER ACCEPTING STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT - SIGNED JUDGE CASTOR 11/14/2019; Notes:ACCEPTING STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT - SIGNED JUDGE CASTOR 11/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:AND MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FB DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AGREEMENT; Notes:SETTLEMENT F/B PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • ANSWER; Notes:DEFT, STATE OF FLORIDA, DEPARTMENT OF HIGHWAY SAFETY AND MOTOR VEHICLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAID $330.00 ON RECEIPT 3370203; Notes:$330.00 3370203 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RH: North Branch Cty Civ, SC, Evictions - RH (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:chad@chadpenner.com;pennerlaw@gmail.com STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF HIGHWAY SAFETY AND MOTOR VEHICLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:chad@chadpenner.com;pennerlaw@gmail.com VINCENT A JULIANO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:chad@chadpenner.com;pennerlaw@gmail.com BETTY J JULIANO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • COMPLAINT; Notes:FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • Receipt Number:3370203; Receipt Amount: $330.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$330.00; total Amount Paid:$330.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • Due Date:10/16/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • Due Date:10/16/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • Due Date:10/16/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • Due Date:10/16/2019; Description:400FF County Civil Claim > $2500; Amount Due:$300.00; Amount Paid:$300.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less