This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 09/27/2022 at 09:15:32 (UTC).

COMPREHENSIVE HEALTH X2 INC (PATIENT BIANCA BOUSQUET) V STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/21/2022 COMPREHENSIVE HEALTH X2 INC PATIENT BIANCA BOUSQUET filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SURBER , MELANIE D and SILVER , ORI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SURBER , MELANIE D

SILVER , ORI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

COMPREHENSIVE HEALTH X2 INC (PATIENT: BIANCA BOUSQUET)

Defendant and Respondent

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

CHRISTENSEN , CHAD

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

KAY , REBECCA

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSION

09/21/2022:RESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSION

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

09/14/2022:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

09/14/2022:RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/14/2022:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

09/14/2022:REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

MOTION TO STRIKE

09/14/2022:MOTION TO STRIKE

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

09/06/2022:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

08/26/2022:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

CORRESPONDENCE REQUEST FOR FEES

08/19/2022:CORRESPONDENCE REQUEST FOR FEES

PAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4546762

08/17/2022:PAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4546762

COMPLAINT

08/16/2022:COMPLAINT

STIP/ORD INVOKE CIV PROCEDURE

08/15/2022:STIP/ORD INVOKE CIV PROCEDURE

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

08/14/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

08/11/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

08/11/2022:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

DEMAND FOR:

08/11/2022:DEMAND FOR:

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/22/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4546762

07/22/2022:PAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4546762

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSION; Notes: DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, AND NOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE; Notes: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes: REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO STRIKE; Notes: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL F/B DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Notes: FB DFT- TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • HearingCANCELLED - SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location: SB; Room: #7 (South Branch); Notes: STORI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE REQUEST FOR FEES; Notes: SERVICE@GEDLAWYERS.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: REBECCA C KAY OBO DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes: F/B DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR:; Notes: TRIAL BY JURY F/B DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 07/22/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: SERVICE@GEDLAWYERS.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 8/23/2022 9:30 AM SURBER, MELANIE D; Notes: SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 8/23/2022 9:30 AM SURBER, MELANIE D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4546762; Notes: $65.00 4546762 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RS: South Branch County Civil Division - RS (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHRISTENSEN , CHAD