This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 09/27/2022 at 11:33:16 (UTC).

COMPREHENSIVE HEALTH ORLANDO INC. (PATIENT BETTY VAUGHN) V STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/21/2022 COMPREHENSIVE HEALTH ORLANDO INC PATIENT BETTY VAUGHN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SURBER , MELANIE D and SILVER , ORI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SURBER , MELANIE D

SILVER , ORI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

COMPREHENSIVE HEALTH ORLANDO INC. (PATIENT: BETTY VAUGHN)

Respondent and Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

CHRISTENSEN , CHAD

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

BROOKS , JONATHAN S

 

Court Documents

AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL DISCOVERY REQUESTS - GRANTED - SIGNED JUDGE SILVER 9/21/2022

09/21/2022:AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL DISCOVERY REQUESTS - GRANTED - SIGNED JUDGE SILVER 9/21/2022

ORDER GRANTING AGREED- DFTS MOTION TO STRIKE PARAGRAPH 25 OF PLTS COMPLAINT -JUDGE SILVER DTD 9/19/22

09/19/2022:ORDER GRANTING AGREED- DFTS MOTION TO STRIKE PARAGRAPH 25 OF PLTS COMPLAINT -JUDGE SILVER DTD 9/19/22

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

09/13/2022:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

RESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSION

08/30/2022:RESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSION

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

08/29/2022:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

08/29/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

08/29/2022:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

08/29/2022:REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

MOTION TO STRIKE

08/29/2022:MOTION TO STRIKE

HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

08/23/2022:HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

08/22/2022:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

MOTION TO STRIKE

08/22/2022:MOTION TO STRIKE

STIP/ORD INVOKE CIV PROCEDURE

08/19/2022:STIP/ORD INVOKE CIV PROCEDURE

MOTION TO INVOKE THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE F/B DFT

08/18/2022:MOTION TO INVOKE THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE F/B DFT

DEMAND FOR:

08/18/2022:DEMAND FOR:

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

08/18/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

08/14/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/25/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL DISCOVERY REQUESTS - GRANTED - SIGNED JUDGE SILVER 9/21/2022; Notes: ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL DISCOVERY REQUESTS - GRANTED - SIGNED JUDGE SILVER 9/21/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING AGREED- DFTS MOTION TO STRIKE PARAGRAPH 25 OF PLTS COMPLAINT -JUDGE SILVER DTD 9/19/22; Notes: AGREED- DFTS MOTION TO STRIKE PARAGRAPH 25 OF PLTS COMPLAINT -JUDGE SILVER DTD 9/19/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Notes: TO RESPOND TO DISCVOERY F/B DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSION; Notes: DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: FIRST F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes: FIRST TO DEFENDANT F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes: FIRST TO DEFENDANT F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes: F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO STRIKE; Notes: AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • HearingSCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location: SB; Room: #7 (South Branch); Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 07/25/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4547366; Receipt Amount: $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $90.00; total Amount Paid: $90.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 07/25/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 07/25/2022; Description: 402FF County Civil Claim > $100 < $500; Amount Due: $80.00; Amount Paid: $80.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: SERVICE@GEDLAWYERS.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 8/23/2022 9:30 AM SURBER, MELANIE D; Notes: SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 8/23/2022 9:30 AM SURBER, MELANIE D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $90.00 ON RECEIPT 4547366; Notes: $90.00 4547366 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RS: South Branch County Civil Division - RS (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes: F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMPREHENSIVE HEALTH ORLANDO DBA is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHRISTENSEN , CHAD