This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 08/14/2020 at 19:17:17 (UTC).

COLUMNA INC/THOMAS ROUSH M.D. A/A/O KAREN RAMOS V STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/10/2020 COLUMNA INC/THOMAS ROUSH M D A/A/O KAREN RAMOS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GARRISON , EDWARD A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GARRISON , EDWARD A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

COLUMNA INC/THOMAS ROUSH M.D. A/A/O KAREN RAMOS

Defendant and Respondent

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

GUDIN , GREGORY E

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

KAY , REBECCA C

 

Court Documents

DEMAND FOR:

08/12/2020:DEMAND FOR:

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

08/12/2020:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

08/12/2020:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/10/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 3678744

07/10/2020:PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 3678744

COMPLAINT

07/10/2020:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/10/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2020
  • HearingSCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location:MB; Room:6M (Main Branch)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR:; Notes:TRIAL BY JURY F/B DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes:F/B DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:F/B ATTY REBECCA KAY OBO DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3678744; Receipt Amount: $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$185.00; total Amount Paid:$185.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:07/10/2020; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:07/10/2020; Description:406FF County Civil Claim >$500 < $2500; Amount Due:$175.00; Amount Paid:$175.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:EFILINGS@PIP-LAWYERS.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 10/5/2020 1:30 PM PIP, HEARINGS; Notes:SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 10/5/2020 1:30 PM PIP, HEARINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 3678744; Notes:$185.00 3678744 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RL: County Civil Central - RL (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less