This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 08/11/2022 at 08:37:17 (UTC).

COLUMNA, INC./THOMAS ROUSH, M.D. A/A/O JASON ELIASSAINT V PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/28/2022 COLUMNA, INC /THOMAS ROUSH, M D A/A/O JASON ELIASSAINT filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GARRISON , EDWARD A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GARRISON , EDWARD A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

COLUMNA, INC./THOMAS ROUSH, M.D. A/A/O JASON ELIASSAINT

Defendant and Respondent

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

GUDIN , GREGORY E

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/28/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

06/28/2022:COMPLAINT

PAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4519757

06/30/2022:PAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4519757

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/30/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

07/20/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

07/22/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

07/25/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 33756 PAGE 1744-1744

08/02/2022:ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 33756 PAGE 1744-1744

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2022
  • HearingSCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location: MB; Room: 6K (Main Branch); Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketDISMISSED AFTER HEARING; Notes: DA - DISMISSED AFTER HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 33756 PAGE 1744-1744; Notes: JUDGE GARRISON 8/2/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY - 07/08/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY - 07/08/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY - 07/08/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4519757; Receipt Amount: $65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $65.00; total Amount Paid: $65.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 06/30/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 06/30/2022; Description: 403FF County Civil Claim < $100; Amount Due: $55.00; Amount Paid: $55.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: EFILINGS@PIP-LAWYERS.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 8/2/2022 1:15 PM GARRISON, EDWARD A; Notes: SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 8/2/2022 1:15 PM GARRISON, EDWARD A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4519757; Notes: $65.00 4519757 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RL: County Civil Central - RL (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes: F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COLUMNA, INC./THOMAS ROUSH M.D. A/A/O BANI GOMEZ is a litigant

Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gudin, Gregory E, ESQ.