This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 07/28/2022 at 19:33:27 (UTC).

COLUMNA INC. / THOMAS ROUSH M.D. A/A/O ROBLES FILS-AIME V PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/28/2022 COLUMNA INC / THOMAS ROUSH M D A/A/O ROBLES FILS-AIME filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BURKE , LAUREN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BURKE , LAUREN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

COLUMNA INC. / THOMAS ROUSH M.D. A/A/O ROBLES FILS-AIME

Defendant and Respondent

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

GUDIN , GREGORY E

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/28/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

06/28/2022:COMPLAINT

PAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4519269

06/29/2022:PAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4519269

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/29/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2022
  • HearingSCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location: MB; Room: 6J (Main Branch); Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4519269; Receipt Amount: $65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $65.00; total Amount Paid: $65.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 06/29/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 06/29/2022; Description: 403FF County Civil Claim < $100; Amount Due: $55.00; Amount Paid: $55.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: EFILINGS@PIP-LAWYERS.COM E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 8/11/2022 2:30 PM BURKE, LAUREN; Notes: SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 8/11/2022 2:30 PM BURKE, LAUREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4519269; Notes: $65.00 4519269 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RJ: County Civil Central - RJ (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COLUMNA, INC./THOMAS ROUSH M.D. A/A/O BANI GOMEZ is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gudin, Gregory E, ESQ.