This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 02/18/2022 at 01:14:07 (UTC).

COLUMNA INC DBA THOMAS ROUSH MD AAO GULIE NSHANYAN V ARBELLA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/28/2021 COLUMNA INC DBA THOMAS ROUSH MD AAO GULIE NSHANYAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ARBELLA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CORLEW , REGINALD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CORLEW , REGINALD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

COLUMNA INC DBA THOMAS ROUSH MD AAO GULIE NSHANYAN

Defendant and Respondent

ARBELLA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BERMAN , RUSSELL F

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/28/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

04/28/2021:COMPLAINT

PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4006649

04/29/2021:PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4006649

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/29/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

05/06/2021:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2021
  • HearingCANCELLED - SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location:SB; Room:ZOOM PIP Pre-Trial (South Branch)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketCancelled SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP on 5/25/2021 9:30:00 AM due to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketDISMISSED BEFORE HEARING; Notes:DB - DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Notes:WITHOUT PREJUDICE. F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4006649; Receipt Amount: $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$185.00; total Amount Paid:$185.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:04/29/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:04/29/2021; Description:406FF County Civil Claim >$500 < $2500; Amount Due:$175.00; Amount Paid:$175.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:SERVICE@THEBERMANLAWGROUP.COM E ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 5/25/2021 9:30 AM SB_PIP, HEARINGS; Notes:SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 5/25/2021 9:30 AM SB_PIP, HEARINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4006649; Notes:$185.00 4006649 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RD: South Branch County Civil Division - RD (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Arbella Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where COLUMNA, INC./THOMAS ROUSH M.D. A/A/O BANI GOMEZ is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Berman, Russell