This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 07/28/2022 at 19:31:38 (UTC).

COLUMNA INC. (ASSIGNEE OF O'REILLY, JUDY) V ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/28/2022 COLUMNA INC ASSIGNEE OF O'REILLY, JUDY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SURBER , MELANIE D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SURBER , MELANIE D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

COLUMNA INC. (ASSIGNEE OF O'REILLY, JUDY)

Defendant and Respondent

ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

KASPER , CHRIS

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/28/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

06/28/2022:COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

06/28/2022:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

06/28/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

06/28/2022:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

06/28/2022:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

PAID $90.00 ON RECEIPT 4519319

06/29/2022:PAID $90.00 ON RECEIPT 4519319

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/29/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2022
  • HearingSCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location: SB; Room: #7 (South Branch); Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4519319; Receipt Amount: $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $90.00; total Amount Paid: $90.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 06/29/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 06/29/2022; Description: 402FF County Civil Claim > $100 < $500; Amount Due: $80.00; Amount Paid: $80.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: SERVICE@WESETTHESTANDARDS.COM E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 8/9/2022 9:30 AM SURBER, MELANIE D; Notes: SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 8/9/2022 9:30 AM SURBER, MELANIE D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $90.00 ON RECEIPT 4519319; Notes: $90.00 4519319 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RS: South Branch County Civil Division - RS (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes: FIRST- E-FILED BY PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes: FIRST-E-FILED BY PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: FIRST TO DEFENDANT-E-FILED BY PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COLUMNA, INC./THOMAS ROUSH M.D. A/A/O BANI GOMEZ is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KASPER , CHRIS