This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 07/16/2022 at 15:14:40 (UTC).

COASTAL HEALTH GROUP AS ASSIGNEE OF PHILLIP BROWN V PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/06/2022 COASTAL HEALTH GROUP AS ASSIGNEE OF PHILLIP BROWN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, North County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHENS , DEBRA MOSES. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-NB

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

STEPHENS , DEBRA MOSES

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

COASTAL HEALTH GROUP AS ASSIGNEE OF PHILLIP BROWN

Defendant and Respondent

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

KARTEN , LINDSAY

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/06/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

06/06/2022:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

PAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4492961

06/07/2022:PAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4492961

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/07/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

06/13/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

06/20/2022:NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 33693 PAGE 76-76

07/01/2022:ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 33693 PAGE 76-76

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2022
  • HearingCANCELLED - SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location: NB; Room: #1 (North Branch); Notes: ODIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketCancelled SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP on 7/26/2022 11:00:00 AM due to; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketDISMISSED BEFORE HEARING; Notes: DB - DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 33693 PAGE 76-76; Notes: UPON NOTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT -JUDGE STEPHENS 7/1/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT; Notes: F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: SERVED ON PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY ON 6/10/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4492961; Receipt Amount: $65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $65.00; total Amount Paid: $65.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 06/07/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 06/07/2022; Description: 403FF County Civil Claim < $100; Amount Due: $55.00; Amount Paid: $55.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: LINDSAY@KMWLEGAL.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 7/26/2022 11:00 AM STEPHENS, DEBRA MOSES; Notes: SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 7/26/2022 11:00 AM STEPHENS, DEBRA MOSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4492961; Notes: $65.00 4492961 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RH: North Branch Cty Civ, SC, Evictions - RH (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes: F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes: F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COASTAL HEALTH GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KARTEN , LINDSAY