This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 07/13/2022 at 19:08:52 (UTC).

COASTAL HEALTH GROUP, AS ASSIGNEE OF MONAYA ABRAMS V GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/13/2022 COASTAL HEALTH GROUP, AS ASSIGNEE OF MONAYA ABRAMS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, North County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHENS , DEBRA MOSES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-NB

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

STEPHENS , DEBRA MOSES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

COASTAL HEALTH GROUP, AS ASSIGNEE OF MONAYA ABRAMS

Respondent and Defendant

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

KARTEN , LINDSAY

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/13/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

06/13/2022:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

PAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4501474

06/14/2022:PAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4501474

SUMMONS REQUESTED

07/07/2022:SUMMONS REQUESTED

PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4532069

07/11/2022:PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4532069

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/11/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2022
  • HearingSCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location: NB; Room: #1 (North Branch); Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4532069; Receipt Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $75.00; total Amount Paid: $75.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 07/11/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: LINDSAY@KMWLEGAL.COM E ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4532069; Notes: $10.00 4532069 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4501474; Receipt Amount: $65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 06/14/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 06/14/2022; Description: 403FF County Civil Claim < $100; Amount Due: $55.00; Amount Paid: $55.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 7/26/2022 8:45 AM STEPHENS, DEBRA MOSES; Notes: SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 7/26/2022 8:45 AM STEPHENS, DEBRA MOSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4501474; Notes: $65.00 4501474 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RH: North Branch Cty Civ, SC, Evictions - RH (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COASTAL HEALTH GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KARTEN , LINDSAY