This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 05/18/2022 at 12:36:51 (UTC).

COASTAL HEALTH GROUP AAO ERDEM ESER V GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/04/2022 COASTAL HEALTH GROUP AAO ERDEM ESER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, North County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHENS , DEBRA MOSES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-NB

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

STEPHENS , DEBRA MOSES

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

COASTAL HEALTH GROUP AAO ERDEM ESER

Defendant and Respondent

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

KARTEN , LINDSAY

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/04/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

04/04/2022:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

PAID $90.00 ON RECEIPT 4415487

04/05/2022:PAID $90.00 ON RECEIPT 4415487

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/05/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

04/20/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

05/17/2022:HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2022
  • HearingSCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location: NB; Room: #1 (North Branch); Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL; Notes: PLT'S ATTY & DFT'S ATTY PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY SERVED 4/18/22 SUB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4415487; Receipt Amount: $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $90.00; total Amount Paid: $90.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 04/05/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 04/05/2022; Description: 402FF County Civil Claim > $100 < $500; Amount Due: $80.00; Amount Paid: $80.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: LINDSAY@KMWLEGAL.COM E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 5/17/2022 11:00 AM STEPHENS, DEBRA MOSES; Notes: SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 5/17/2022 11:00 AM STEPHENS, DEBRA MOSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $90.00 ON RECEIPT 4415487; Notes: $90.00 4415487 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RH: North Branch Cty Civ, SC, Evictions - RH (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COASTAL HEALTH GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KARTEN , LINDSAY