This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 06/08/2022 at 23:18:44 (UTC).

CLORAN, KELLY V ROSS DRESS FOR LESS INC

Case Summary

On 04/28/2022 CLORAN, KELLY filed an Other lawsuit against ROSS DRESS FOR LESS INC. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KERNER , SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KERNER , SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CLORAN , KELLY

Defendants and Respondents

ROESCH , EDWARD

ROSS DRESS FOR LESS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BEBERGAL , MARC L

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

GLUSMAN , JASON A

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/28/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

04/28/2022:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/28/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/28/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

04/28/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

04/28/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

04/28/2022:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

04/28/2022:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

04/28/2022:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

PAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 4447417

05/02/2022:PAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 4447417

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

05/04/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

05/06/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

05/12/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

06/03/2022:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes: F/B DFTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: AND DESIGNATION OFE-MAIL ADDRESS F/B ATTY JASON A GLUSMAN OBO DFTS ROSS DRESS FOR LESS INC AND EDWARD ROESCH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SUBSTITUTE EDWARD ROESCH - 05/05/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ROSS DRESS FOR LESS, INC - 05/02/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4447417; Receipt Amount: $421.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $421.00; total Amount Paid: $421.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/02/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/02/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/02/2022; Description: 800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due: $401.00; Amount Paid: $401.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 4447417; Notes: $421.00 4447417 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: AN: Circuit Civil Central - AN (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: PREMISES TO DFT EDWARD ROESCH F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: INSURANCE TO DFT ROSS DRESS FOR LESS INC F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: PREMISES TO DFT ROSS DRESS FOR LESS INC F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes: PREMISES TO DFT EDWARD ROESCH F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes: PREMISES TO DFT ROSS DRESS FOR LESS INC F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: mbebergal@800goldlaw.com;mperez@800goldlaw.com;lmckenzie@800goldlaw.com AS TO EDWARD ROESCH EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: mbebergal@800goldlaw.com;mperez@800goldlaw.com;lmckenzie@800goldlaw.com AS TO ROSS DRESS FOR LESS INC EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROSS DRESS FOR LESS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bebergal, Marc L