This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 02/19/2021 at 17:36:23 (UTC).

CLARK, KATHERINE W

Case Summary

On 01/15/2021 CLARK, KATHERINE W was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KERNER , SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KERNER , SCOTT

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Not Classified By Court

FRYREAR , ANASTASIA F

FANDOS , CHARLES W

Decedent

CLARK , KATHERINE W

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court Attorney

DEVITT III, FRED B

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3911414; Receipt Amount: $6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$422.00; total Amount Paid:$422.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:02/17/2021; Description:CP Probate Service Charges PB 01262020; Amount Due:$6.00; Amount Paid:$6.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION; Notes:NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketPAID $6.00 ON RECEIPT 3911414; Notes:$6.00 3911414 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketRECEIPT OF OF NOTICE OF ADMIN F/B MARIA HALLAS; Notes:OF NOTICE OF ADMIN F/B MARIA HALLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF SRV NOT TO CREDITORS; Notes:F/B PR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketRECEIPT OF NOTICE OF ADMIN F/B VASILIKE T. TSICHLIS; Notes:NOTICE OF ADMIN F/B VASILIKE T. TSICHLIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketRECEIPT OF NOTICE OF ADMIN F/B MARIA TERSS; Notes:NOTICE OF ADMIN F/B MARIA TERSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketRECEIPT OF NOTICE OF ADMIN F/B VASILIKE HALLAS; Notes:NOTICE OF ADMIN F/B VASILIKE HALLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FED EST TAX RTRN DUE; Notes:F/B ANASTASIA F FRYREAR AND CHARLES W FANDOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketOATH; Notes:OF PR AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT F/B CHARLES W FANDOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketOATH; Notes:OF PR AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT F/B ANASTASIA F FRYREAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION; Notes:F/B PETITIONERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes:FRITZ@DTLLAW.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRUST; Notes:F/B ANASTASIA F FRYREAR AND CHARLES W FANDOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERT PROBATE DECEDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING; Notes:F/B ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:IZ: South Branch Probate - IZ (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/1921
  • DocketWILL BOOK 32136 PAGE 547-550; Notes:F/B ATT. DEVITT OBO ANASTASIA F. FRYREAR & CHARLES W. FANDOS ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DEVITT III, FRED B