This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 02/14/2023 at 22:41:32 (UTC).

CITIMORTGAGE INC V HEALY, RICHARD

Case Summary

On 01/05/2023 CITIMORTGAGE INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against HEALY, RICHARD. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BELL , CAROLYN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BELL , CAROLYN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CITIMORTGAGE INC

Defendants and Respondents

HEALY , GWENDOLYN

HEALY , RICHARD

THIRD FEDERAL SA VIN GS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION GF CLEVELAND

UNKNOWN TENANT #1

UNKNOWN TENANT #2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

ULLMAN , ZACHARY

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

VAN NESS , J ANTHONY

 

Court Documents

PAID $21.10 ON RECEIPT 4767747

02/06/2023:PAID $21.10 ON RECEIPT 4767747

FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET

02/03/2023:FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET

RELEASE/CANCEL LIS PENDENS BOOK 34108 PAGE 1838-1838

02/03/2023:RELEASE/CANCEL LIS PENDENS BOOK 34108 PAGE 1838-1838

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

01/31/2023:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

01/31/2023:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

01/31/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

01/31/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

01/31/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

ANSWER

01/23/2023:ANSWER

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

01/20/2023:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

PAID $961.60 ON RECEIPT 4735535

01/09/2023:PAID $961.60 ON RECEIPT 4735535

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

01/05/2023:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/05/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/05/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/05/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/05/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/05/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/05/2023:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4767747; Receipt Amount: $21.10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $982.70; total Amount Paid: $982.70; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 02/06/2023; Description: VDAL Voluntary Dismissal Legal Description; Amount Due: $0.60; Amount Paid: $0.60; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 02/06/2023; Description: VD2P Volun Diss Each Additional Page $8.50; Amount Due: $8.50; Amount Paid: $8.50; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 02/06/2023; Description: VD1P Volun Diss 1st Page $10.00; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 02/06/2023; Description: Efile fee INDX $1 fee party after 4; Amount Due: $2.00; Amount Paid: $2.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $21.10 ON RECEIPT 4767747; Notes: $21.10 4767747 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketDISPOSED BEFORE OTHER; Notes: DBO - DISPOSED BEFORE OTHER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION SHEET; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRELEASE/CANCEL LIS PENDENS BOOK 34108 PAGE 1838-1838; Notes: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND DISCHARGE F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes: F/B ATTY ULLMAN OBO PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: efiling@aldridgepite.com;courtxpress@firmsolutions.us ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT #2 EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: efiling@aldridgepite.com;courtxpress@firmsolutions.us ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT #1 EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: efiling@aldridgepite.com;courtxpress@firmsolutions.us ISSUED TO THE THIRD FEDERAL SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION OF CLEVELAND EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: efiling@aldridgepite.com;courtxpress@firmsolutions.us ISSUED TO GWENDOLYN HEALY EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: efiling@aldridgepite.com;courtxpress@firmsolutions.us ISSUED TO RICHARD HEALY EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes: VAALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS BOOK 34059 PAGE 1057-1057; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less