Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 07/30/2019 at 00:14:41 (UTC).

CITIMORTGAGE INC V DUNNE, BRIAN W

Case Summary

On 09/13/2012 CITIMORTGAGE INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against DUNNE, BRIAN W. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CITIMORTGAGE INC

Defendants and Respondents

DUNNE, BRIAN W

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BRIAN W DUNNE

LANTERN KEY HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

DUNNE, STEPHANIE S

TENANT #1

TENANT #2

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

DUNNE , BRIAN W

DUNNE , STEPHANIE S

CLERK OF THE CIRCUIT COURT PALM BEACH COUNTY

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF STEPHANIE S DUNNE

HENSON , JEANNE

9 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

DONNELLY ESQ, JOSH D

EWING ESQ, BENJAMIN A

GARNER , JENNIFER A

HARRIS , JOSHUA

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

LEVINE , SCOTT JASON

PETERSON , HAMPTON C

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING

10/16/2014:NOTICE OF HEARING

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

10/03/2014:PROOF OF PUBLICATION

NOTICE OF SALE

09/18/2014:NOTICE OF SALE

ORDER

07/10/2014:ORDER

DEFAULT

04/15/2014:DEFAULT

ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

04/07/2014:ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

CERTIFICATE

04/07/2014:CERTIFICATE

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/12/2014:SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

01/22/2014:NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/30/2013:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/30/2013:SUMMONS ISSUED

ORDER

10/23/2013:ORDER

STIP SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

07/17/2013:STIP SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

ORDER

07/10/2013:ORDER

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/30/2012:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/30/2012:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/30/2012:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/13/2012:SUMMONS ISSUED

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE; Notes:F\B PLT-ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT ENTERED ON SEPTEMBER 3, 2014; MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE OF OCTOBER 20, 2014; MOTION TO RELEASE LIS PENDES AND MOTION TO DISMISS ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE Filed by PLAINTIFF CITIMORTGAGE INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • VACATE FINAL JDGMNT & DISMISS BOOK 27113 PAGE 595; Notes:ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT ENTERED ON SEPTEMBER 3, 2014; MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE OF OCTOBER 20, 2014; MOTION TO RELEASE LIS PENDENS; AND MOTION TO DISMISS ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE GRANTED R OFTEDAL DTD 10/20/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • REDISPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING; Notes:NOTICE OF HEARING ON 10/20/14 @ 8:45, RE: ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT ENTERED ON SEPTEMBER 3,2014; MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE OF OCTOBER 20, 2014; MOTION TO RELEASE LS PENDENS; AND MOTION TO DISMISS ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE. EFIL Filed By ATTORNEY BENJAMIN A EWING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION; Notes:MOTION TO VACATE FINAL IUDGMENT ENTERED ON SEPTEMBER 3, 2014; MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE OF OCTOBER 20 2014; MOTION TO RELEASE LIS PENDENS; AND MOTION TO DISMISS ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED BY PLT Filed by PLAINTIFF CITIMORTGAGE INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2014
  • REOPEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF PUBLICATION; Notes:NOTICE OF SALE Filed by PLAINTIFF CITIMORTGAGE INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SALE; Notes:10/20/14 CITIMORTGAGE INC V BRIAN W DUNNE Filed by PLAINTIFF CITIMORTGAGE INC 10/20/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURNED MAIL; Notes:BRIAN W. DUNNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURNED MAIL; Notes:UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF STEPHANIE S DUNNE NKA BRIAN DUNNE

    Read MoreRead Less
68 More Docket Entries
  • 03/12/2014
  • Receipt Number:CAMB876855; Receipt Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2013
  • Receipt Number:CAMB837645; Receipt Amount: $43.60

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2012
  • Receipt Number:CAMB713181; Receipt Amount: $974.10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2014
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$1,037.70; total Amount Paid:$1,037.70; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2014
  • Due Date:04/07/2014; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2014
  • Due Date:03/12/2014; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2013
  • Due Date:10/31/2013; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$43.60; Amount Paid:$43.60; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2012
  • Due Date:09/20/2012; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$62.50; Amount Paid:$62.50; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2012
  • Due Date:09/20/2012; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$906.00; Amount Paid:$906.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2012
  • Due Date:09/20/2012; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$5.60; Amount Paid:$5.60; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiMortgage, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PETERSON , HAMPTON C

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Levine, Scott J