Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 04/25/2021 at 18:42:32 (UTC).

CITIBANK N.A. V TANK, FRANCES M

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 CITIBANK N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TANK, FRANCES M. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CASTOR , FRANK S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CASTOR , FRANK S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CITIBANK N.A.

Defendant and Respondent

TANK , FRANCES M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LINEN , DREW

LA VRAR , FLYNN

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

04/15/2021:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

COMPLAINT

04/15/2021:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/16/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 3990387

04/16/2021:PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 3990387

SUMMONS REQUESTED

04/15/2021:SUMMONS REQUESTED

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD ATTORNEY F/B PLT

04/15/2021:NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD ATTORNEY F/B PLT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/15/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2021
  • HearingSCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location:MB; Room:ZOOM DIVISION RB (Main Branch)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3990387; Receipt Amount: $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$310.00; total Amount Paid:$310.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:04/16/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:04/16/2021; Description:400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due:$300.00; Amount Paid:$300.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:SERVICE@RASLAVRAR.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 5/18/2021 10:00 AM CASTOR, JUDGEFRANK S; Notes:SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 5/18/2021 10:00 AM CASTOR, JUDGEFRANK S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 3990387; Notes:$310.00 3990387 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RB: County Civil Central - RB (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD ATTORNEY F/B PLT; Notes:OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD ATTORNEY F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LaVrar, Flynn, ESQ.