This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 12/29/2021 at 19:23:40 (UTC).

CITIBANK, N.A. V ROBBINS, LAURENCE

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 CITIBANK, N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ROBBINS, LAURENCE. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PARNOFIELLO , JOHN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PARNOFIELLO , JOHN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CITIBANK, N.A.

Defendant and Respondent

ROBBINS , LAURENCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LINEN , DREW

LA VRAR , FLYNN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/24/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

11/24/2021:COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD ATTORNEY F/B PLT

11/24/2021:NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD ATTORNEY F/B PLT

SUMMONS REQUESTED

11/24/2021:SUMMONS REQUESTED

PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4260084

11/24/2021:PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4260084

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/24/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

ORDER RESETTING

12/13/2021:ORDER RESETTING

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2022
  • HearingSCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location:MB; Room:6J (Main Branch)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • HearingCANCELLED - SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location:MB; Room:6J (Main Branch)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 1/27/2022 2:00 PM PARNOFIELLO, JOHN; Notes:SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 1/27/2022 2:00 PM PARNOFIELLO, JOHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketCancelled SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney on 12/30/2021 1:30:00 PM due to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER RESETTING; Notes:P/T CONFERENCE TO 1/27/2022@2PM- JUDGE PARNOFIELLO DTD 12/13/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4260084; Receipt Amount: $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$310.00; total Amount Paid:$310.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:11/24/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:11/24/2021; Description:400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due:$300.00; Amount Paid:$300.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:SERVICE@RASLAVRAR.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 12/30/2021 1:30 PM PARNOFIELLO, JOHN; Notes:SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 12/30/2021 1:30 PM PARNOFIELLO, JOHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4260084; Notes:$310.00 4260084 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD ATTORNEY F/B PLT; Notes:OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD ATTORNEY F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RJ: County Civil Central - RJ (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LaVrar, Flynn, ESQ.