This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 08/21/2019 at 13:39:36 (UTC).

CITIBANK NA V BERAGLIA, MIMMA

Case Summary

On 12/19/2018 CITIBANK NA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against BERAGLIA, MIMMA. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CURLEY , G JOSEPH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CURLEY , G JOSEPH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CITIBANK NA

Defendants and Respondents

UNKNOWN PARTY # 3

BERAGLIA , MIMMA

BERAGLIA , CLAUDIA

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NA

ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER AND AGAINST THE HEREIN NAMED INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANT(S) WHO ARE NOT KNOWN TO BE DEAD OR ALIVE WHETHER SAID UNKNOWN PARTIES MAY CLAIM AN INTEREST AS SPOUSES HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES OR OTHER CLAIMANTS

UNKNOWN PARTY # 1

UNKNOWN PARTY # 4

UNKNOWN HEIRS DEVISEES ASSIGNEES LIENORS CREDITORS TRUSTEES OR OTHER CLAIMANTS CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER OR AGAINST ROY BERAGLIA DECEASED

BERAGLIA , AMANDA DANIELLE

UNKNOWN PARTY # 2

ISLES AT WELLINGTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC

BOUDREAU , CRAIG A

Guardian Ad Litem

STEPPER , STEVEN

13 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

PAVLIDIS , CHRISTOS

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

PETERSON , JAMES A

HACKMAN , CHELSEA A

DISKIN , LARA

BOUDREAU , CRAIG ANTHONY

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO DISMISS

07/15/2019:MOTION TO DISMISS

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

06/17/2019:NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

05/28/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

NOTICE OF SERVING PLEADINGS F/B PLT

05/09/2019:NOTICE OF SERVING PLEADINGS F/B PLT

REPORT

05/09/2019:REPORT

NOTICE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

04/23/2019:NOTICE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

04/17/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

04/17/2019:NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ORDER ON ATTORNEYS MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR MIMMA BERAGLIA FILED BY PLT

02/22/2019:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ORDER ON ATTORNEYS MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR MIMMA BERAGLIA FILED BY PLT

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/20/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/20/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

MOTION TO DISMISS

02/19/2019:MOTION TO DISMISS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

01/04/2019:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

01/04/2019:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/19/2018:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/19/2018:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/19/2018:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/19/2018:SUMMONS ISSUED

77 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2019
  • DISPOSED AFTER OTHER; Notes:DAO - DISPOSED AFTER OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 30810 PAGE 275-277; Notes:G CURLEY: (AGREED) ON JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS ACTION, RELEASE LIS PENDENS AND RETURN ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS: GRNATED. CLERK TO RETURN THE ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE FILED ON5-9-19 TO PLT'S CO COUNSEL. SEE ORDER. DTD 8-6-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO DISMISS; Notes:(JOINT) ACTION, RELEASE LIS PENDENS AND RETURN ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORD SUBSTITUTION COUNSEL; Notes:G JOS CURLEY DTD 6/21/19 : ALBERTELLI LAW IS RELIEVED OF REPRESENTATION OF ACTION FOR PLTF . SAMANTHA DARRIGO ESA BAR# 0092331 IS SUBSTITUTED AS COUNSELOF RECORD FOR PLTF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AGREED ORDER G CURLEY: ON DFT, MIMMA BERAGLIA'S MOTION TO DISIMSS: DENIED. DTD 6-19-19; Notes:G CURLEY: ON DFT, MIMMA BERAGLIA'S MOTION TO DISIMSS: DENIED. DTD 6-19-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Notes:NOTICE OF CANCELLING HEARING 6/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes:PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
88 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2018
  • Due Date:12/20/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Due Date:12/20/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Due Date:12/20/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Due Date:12/20/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Due Date:12/20/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Due Date:12/20/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Due Date:12/20/2018; Description:Lis Pendens 1st Page $5.60; Amount Due:$5.60; Amount Paid:$5.60; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Due Date:12/20/2018; Description:Efile fee INDX $1 fee party after 4; Amount Due:$5.00; Amount Paid:$5.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Due Date:12/20/2018; Description:8XDT Additional DFT over 5 $2.50; Amount Due:$17.50; Amount Paid:$17.50; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Due Date:12/20/2018; Description:800F1 CircCivil Real Prop $50,000 or < PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less