This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 05/12/2022 at 05:49:46 (UTC).

CITIBANK N.A. NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS OWNER TRUSTEE OF NEW RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2019-RPL3 V MCQUENNIE, SAMUEL A

Case Summary

On 03/18/2022 CITIBANK N A NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS OWNER TRUSTEE OF NEW RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2019-RPL3 filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MCQUENNIE, SAMUEL A. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HARPER , BRADLEY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HARPER , BRADLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CITIBANK N.A. NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS OWNER TRUSTEE OF NEW RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2019-RPL3

Defendants and Respondents

GREYSTONE AT BOYNTON BEACH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

MCQUENNIE , NEOLA

MCQUENNIE , SAMUEL A

TECHNOLOGY CREDIT UNION

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF NEOLA MCQUENNIE

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF SAMUEL A MCQUENNIE AKA SAMUEL MCQUENNIE

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

RUGGERIO , JASON

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

BROUGH , DAVID L

 

Court Documents

PAID $4.00 ON RECEIPT 4450588

05/03/2022:PAID $4.00 ON RECEIPT 4450588

PAID $19.10 ON RECEIPT 4437222

04/22/2022:PAID $19.10 ON RECEIPT 4437222

RELEASE/CANCEL LIS PENDENS

04/21/2022:RELEASE/CANCEL LIS PENDENS

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

04/11/2022:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

04/11/2022:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

04/11/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

04/11/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

04/11/2022:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

04/11/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

04/11/2022:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

04/11/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

ANSWER

04/06/2022:ANSWER

PAID $1,998.60 ON RECEIPT 4395827

03/22/2022:PAID $1,998.60 ON RECEIPT 4395827

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/18/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/18/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/18/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/18/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/18/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4450588; Receipt Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $4.00 ON RECEIPT 4450588; Notes:$4.00 4450588 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4437222; Receipt Amount: $19.10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$2,021.70; total Amount Paid:$2,021.70; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • FinancialDue Date:04/22/2022; Description:VDAL Voluntary Dismissal Legal Description; Amount Due:$0.60; Amount Paid:$0.60; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • FinancialDue Date:04/22/2022; Description:VD2P Volun Diss Each Additional Page $8.50; Amount Due:$8.50; Amount Paid:$8.50; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • FinancialDue Date:04/22/2022; Description:VD1P Volun Diss 1st Page $10.00; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $19.10 ON RECEIPT 4437222; Notes:$19.10 4437222 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • FinancialDue Date:04/21/2022; Description:INDX $1 Index Fee each party after 4; Amount Due:$4.00; Amount Paid:$4.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketDISPOSED BEFORE OTHER; Notes:DBO - DISPOSED BEFORE OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:jruggerio@lenderlegal.com;ehaldeman@lenderlegal.com;eservice@lenderlegal.com AS TO GREYSTONE AT BOYN TON BEACH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:jruggerio@lenderlegal.com;ehaldeman@lenderlegal.com;eservice@lenderlegal.com AS TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF NEOLA MCQUENNIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:jruggerio@lenderlegal.com;ehaldeman@lenderlegal.com;eservice@lenderlegal.com AS TO NEOLA MCQUENNIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:jruggerio@lenderlegal.com;ehaldeman@lenderlegal.com;eservice@lenderlegal.com AS TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE 0F SAMUEL A. MCQUENNIE A/K/A SAMUEL MCQUENNIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:jruggerio@lenderlegal.com;ehaldeman@lenderlegal.com;eservice@lenderlegal.com AS TO SAMUEL A. MCQUENNIE A/K/A SAMUEL MCQUENNIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER; Notes:F/ PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE; Notes:OF NOTE POSSESSION F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:(VERIFIED MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE) F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS BOOK 33423 PAGE 752-753; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GREYSTONE AT BOYNTON BEACH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC., A FLORIDA NOT-FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where TECHNOLOGY CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases where CITIBANK NA NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLEY AS TRUSTEE OF CRZ PASS-THROUGH TRUST VI is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUGGERIO JASON KYLE