This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 12/21/2021 at 19:49:16 (UTC).

CIRCLE K STORES INC V 5 STAR OIL FLORIDA LLC

Case Summary

On 11/16/2021 CIRCLE K STORES INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against 5 STAR OIL FLORIDA LLC. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MARX , JOSEPH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MARX , JOSEPH

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

CIRCLE K STORES INC

TMC FRANCHISE CORPORATION

Defendants and Respondents

5 STAR OIL FLORIDA LLC

ALI , HYDER

BABAR , MOHAMMED

BOCA GAS CO INC

JAFERI , ABBAS

JAFERI , ATHER SULTANA

RUSDIA PETRO INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

DOMINGUEZ , MANUEL J

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/16/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

11/16/2021:COMPLAINT

PAID $406.00 ON RECEIPT 4250853

11/17/2021:PAID $406.00 ON RECEIPT 4250853

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/07/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/07/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/07/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/07/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/13/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/13/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/13/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $70.00 ON RECEIPT 4279342

12/13/2021:PAID $70.00 ON RECEIPT 4279342

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4279342; Receipt Amount: $70.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$476.00; total Amount Paid:$476.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:12/13/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:12/13/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:12/13/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:12/13/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:12/13/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:12/13/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:12/13/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $70.00 ON RECEIPT 4279342; Notes:$70.00 4279342 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:jdominguez@cohenmilstein.com;mjohndominguez@yahoo.com;lcuomo@cohenmilstein.com AS TO DFT HYDER ALI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:jdominguez@cohenmilstein.com;mjohndominguez@yahoo.com;lcuomo@cohenmilstein.com AS TO DFT ABBAS JAFERI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:jdominguez@cohenmilstein.com;mjohndominguez@yahoo.com;lcuomo@cohenmilstein.com AS TO DFT BOCA GAS CO INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4250853; Receipt Amount: $406.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:11/17/2021; Description:8XDT Additional DFT over 5 $2.50; Amount Due:$5.00; Amount Paid:$5.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:11/17/2021; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $406.00 ON RECEIPT 4250853; Notes:$406.00 4250853 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AJ: Circuit Civil Central - AJ (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TMC Franchise Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Circle K Stores Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DOMINGUEZ ESQ, MANUEL J