Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 02/16/2021 at 23:13:51 (UTC).

CHIROPRACTIC CLINICS OF SOUTH FLORIDA PL A/A/O PILAR RODRIGUEZ V INFINITY INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/17/2020 CHIROPRACTIC CLINICS OF SOUTH FLORIDA PL A/A/O PILAR RODRIGUEZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against INFINITY INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRYSON , MARNI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRYSON , MARNI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CHIROPRACTIC CLINICS OF SOUTH FLORIDA PL A/A/O PILAR RODRIGUEZ

Defendant and Respondent

INFINITY INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

DOYLE , CONOR J

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

BLACKMON , JENNIFER

 

Court Documents

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/08/2021:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

PIP SCHEDULING ORDER

01/05/2021:PIP SCHEDULING ORDER

STIP/ORD INVOKE CIV PROCEDURE

01/05/2021:STIP/ORD INVOKE CIV PROCEDURE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

12/31/2020:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/18/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 3847753

12/18/2020:PAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 3847753

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

12/17/2020:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/17/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes:TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. F/B DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • HearingSCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location:SB; Room:#6 (South Branch)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPIP SCHEDULING ORDER; Notes:PAIGE GILLMAN 01/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIP/ORD INVOKE CIV PROCEDURE; Notes:PAIGE GILLMAN 01/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL F/B ATTY JENNIFER BLACKMON OBO DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3847753; Receipt Amount: $65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$65.00; total Amount Paid:$65.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:12/18/2020; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:12/18/2020; Description:403FF County Civil Claim < $100; Amount Due:$55.00; Amount Paid:$55.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:ESERVICE@BOTTARIANDDOYLE.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 1/19/2021 9:30 AM SB_PIP, HEARINGS; Notes:SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 1/19/2021 9:30 AM SB_PIP, HEARINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 3847753; Notes:$65.00 3847753 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RS: South Branch County Civil Division - RS (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Infinity Indemnity Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Chiropractic Clinics of South Florida PL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Blackmon, Jennifer, ESQ