Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 04/24/2021 at 18:53:19 (UTC).

CHIROMED HEALTH AND WELLNESS CENTER A/A/O SANTOS GUTIERREZ V OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 CHIROMED HEALTH AND WELLNESS CENTER A/A/O SANTOS GUTIERREZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GARRISON , EDWARD A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GARRISON , EDWARD A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CHIROMED HEALTH AND WELLNESS CENTER A/A/O SANTOS GUTIERREZ

Defendant and Respondent

OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

POULOPOULOS ESQ, THEOPHILOS

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

SILVANIC , BENJAMIN W

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF FILING UPON TRANSFER

04/15/2021:NOTICE OF FILING UPON TRANSFER

NOTICE OF HEARING ON TRANSFER CASE

04/15/2021:NOTICE OF HEARING ON TRANSFER CASE

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT UNIFORM ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL DEADLINES

04/14/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT UNIFORM ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL DEADLINES

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES

04/14/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH TRANSFER ORDER

04/14/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH TRANSFER ORDER

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

04/14/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSE

04/14/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSE

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES

04/14/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES

04/14/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

04/14/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT WITNESS LIST

04/14/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT WITNESS LIST

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT PLAINTIFF'S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

04/14/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT PLAINTIFF'S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/14/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT CIVIL COVER SHEET

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

04/14/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

04/14/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE ADDITIONAL REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

04/14/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE ADDITIONAL REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

CERTIFIED COPY

04/14/2021:CERTIFIED COPY

RECEIPT OF

04/14/2021:RECEIPT OF

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2021
  • HearingSCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location:MB; Room:ZOOM PIP Pre-Trial (Main Branch)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING UPON TRANSFER; Notes:PIPSERVICE@INJUREDINFLORIDA.COM;FILINGS@LDPLAW.NET EISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ON TRANSFER CASE; Notes:PIPSERVICE@INJUREDINFLORIDA.COM; FILINGS@DPLAW.NET EISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 5/17/2021 1:30 PM PIP, HEARINGS; Notes:SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 5/17/2021 1:30 PM PIP, HEARINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3987950; Receipt Amount: $55.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$55.00; total Amount Paid:$55.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:04/14/2021; Description:403FF County Civil Claim < $100; Amount Due:$55.00; Amount Paid:$55.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT UNIFORM ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL DEADLINES; Notes:UNIFORM ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL DEADLINES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT; Notes:PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES; Notes:PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT CIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT SUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Notes:PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; Notes:DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE ADDITIONAL REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes:PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE ADDITIONAL REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $55.00 ON RECEIPT 3987950; Notes:$55.00 3987950 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY; Notes:CERTIFIED PROGRESS DOCKET LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY; Notes:ORDER TO TRANSFR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT OF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RL: County Civil Central - RL (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHIROMED HEALTH AND WELLNESS CENTER INC A/A/O MARIO ABREU is a litigant

Latest cases where Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Silvanic, Benjamin W