Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 04/16/2021 at 17:26:42 (UTC).

CHANTECLAIR VILLAS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION NUMBER THREE INC V STEPHENSON, ROBERT GEORGES

Case Summary

On 04/06/2021 CHANTECLAIR VILLAS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION NUMBER THREE INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against STEPHENSON, ROBERT GEORGES. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CURLEY , G JOSEPH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CURLEY , G JOSEPH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CHANTECLAIR VILLAS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION NUMBER THREE INC

Defendants and Respondents

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 2

SYNOVUS BANK

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ROBERT GEORGES STEPHENSON

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 1

CITY OF BOYNTON BEACH

STEPHENSON , ROBERT GEORGES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

STEINER , MICHAEL S

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

04/15/2021:NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

04/15/2021:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

04/15/2021:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

04/15/2021:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

04/15/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

04/15/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

04/15/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

PAID $471.10 ON RECEIPT 3979490

04/08/2021:PAID $471.10 ON RECEIPT 3979490

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/06/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/06/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/06/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/06/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/06/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/06/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

04/06/2021:COMPLAINT

LIS PENDENS

04/06/2021:LIS PENDENS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/06/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY; Notes:UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ROBERT GEORGGES STEPHENSON, UKNOWN OCCUPANT #1 AND UNKNOWN OCCUPANT #2 (F/B PLT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED; Notes:UNKNOWN OCCUPANT #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED; Notes:UNKNOWN OCCUPANT #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED; Notes:UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ROBERT GEORGES STEPHENSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:ROBERT GEORGE STEPHENSON (SER 4/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:CITY OF BOYNTON BEACH (SER 4/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:SYNOVUS BANK (SER 4/9/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3979490; Receipt Amount: $471.10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$471.10; total Amount Paid:$471.10; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:04/08/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AI: Circuit Civil Central - AI (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:lit@lawkl.com;eservice@lawkl.com AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT #2 EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:lit@lawkl.com;eservice@lawkl.com AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT #1 EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:lit@lawkl.com;eservice@lawkl.com AS TO SYNOVUS BANK EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:lit@lawkl.com;eservice@lawkl.com AS TO CITY OF BOYNTON BEACH EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:lit@lawkl.com;eservice@lawkl.com AS TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ROBERT GEORGES STEPHENSON EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:lit@lawkl.com;eservice@lawkl.com AS TO ROBERT GEORGES STEPHENSON EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:FOR FORECLOSURE DAMAGES PRE JUDGMENT INTEREST COSTS AND ATTORNEY FEES F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS BOOK 32376 PAGE 1017-1017; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SYNOVUS BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEINER , MICHAEL S