This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 02/14/2021 at 15:57:52 (UTC).

CHANDLER, CARMEN V STARWOOD RETAIL PARTNERS LLC

Case Summary

On 12/01/2020 CHANDLER, CARMEN filed an Other lawsuit against STARWOOD RETAIL PARTNERS LLC. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KELLEY , GLENN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KELLEY , GLENN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CHANDLER , CARMEN

Defendants and Respondents

FEDERAL CLEANING CONTRACTORS INC

STARWOOD RETAIL PARTNERS LLC

STARWOOD RETAIL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC

TM WELLINGTON GREEN MALL LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MURRAY , SCOTT C

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

HEALEY , KATHARINE T

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

02/10/2021:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

REPLY/RESPONSE

02/02/2021:REPLY/RESPONSE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/14/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

01/14/2021:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

01/14/2021:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

01/14/2021:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 3873603

01/14/2021:PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 3873603

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/11/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

01/11/2021:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/11/2021:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/11/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

01/11/2021:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/11/2021:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/11/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

01/11/2021:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/11/2021:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/11/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

01/11/2021:COMPLAINT

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Notes:F/B DFT'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY/RESPONSE; Notes:REPLY TO DEFENDANTS ANSWER AND PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO STRIKE AND/OR MODIFY AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3873603; Receipt Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$431.00; total Amount Paid:$431.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:01/14/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:F/B DFTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF SOCIAL MEDIA INTERROGATORIES TO PLT F/B DFTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLT F/B DFTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes:TO PLTS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF COMPLIANE WITH RULE 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS F/B DFTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 3873603; Notes:$10.00 3873603 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:INITIAL REQUEST TO DEFENDANT FEDERAL CLEANING CONTRACTORS, INC A/K/A FEDERAL BUILDING SERVICES, INC F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:NOTICE OF SERVING INITIAL SET OF INTERROGATORIES UPON DEFENDANT FEDERAL CLEANING CONTRACTORS, INC A/K/A FEDERAL BUILDING SERVICES, INC F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes:INITIAL REQUEST TO DEFENDANT FEDERAL CLEANING CONTRACTORS, INC A/K/A FEDERAL BUILDING SERVICES, INC F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:INITIAL REQUEST TO DEFENDANT STARWOOD RETAIL PARTNERS, LLC F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:NOTICE OF SERVING INITIAL SET OF INTERROGATORIES UPON DEFENDANT STARWOOD RETAIL PARTNERS, LLC F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes:TO DEFENDANT STARWOOD RETAIL PARTNERS, LLC F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:pleadings@murrayguari.com;mcarney@murrayguari.com;jcozza@murrayguari.com AS TO FEDERAL CLEANING CONTRACTORS, INC A/K/A FEDERAL BUILDING SERVICES, INC EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:pleadings@murrayguari.com;mcarney@murrayguari.com;jcozza@murrayguari.com AS TO STARWOOD RETAIL PARTNERS, LLC EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STARWOOD RETAIL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where STARWOOD RETAIL PARTNERS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where TM WELLINGTON GREEN MALL is a litigant

Latest cases where FEDERAL CLEANING CONTRACTORS INC. is a litigant