This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 09/19/2022 at 09:15:54 (UTC).

CERTIFIED SPINE AND PAIN CARE, LLC A/A/O EDUARDO BENEDETTI V PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/26/2022 CERTIFIED SPINE AND PAIN CARE, LLC A/A/O EDUARDO BENEDETTI filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SHERMAN , JAMES W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SHERMAN , JAMES W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CERTIFIED SPINE AND PAIN CARE, LLC A/A/O EDUARDO BENEDETTI

Defendant and Respondent

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

GUDIN , GREGORY E

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

FORST , KRISTINA DAVIS

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/26/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

07/26/2022:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS REQUESTED

07/26/2022:SUMMONS REQUESTED

PAID $75.00 ON RECEIPT 4552202

07/27/2022:PAID $75.00 ON RECEIPT 4552202

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/27/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4552202

08/04/2022:PAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4552202

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

08/15/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

08/16/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

DEMAND FOR:

08/18/2022:DEMAND FOR:

MOTION TO INVOKE F.R.C.P. F/B DFT

08/18/2022:MOTION TO INVOKE F.R.C.P. F/B DFT

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

08/22/2022:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

STIP INVOKING CIVIL PROCEDURE

08/23/2022:STIP INVOKING CIVIL PROCEDURE

ORDER EXCUSING PARTIES FROM IN PERSON PRE-TRIAL AND DENYING MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE. SIGNED ON 8/23/22 BY JDG JAMES SHERMAN.

08/23/2022:ORDER EXCUSING PARTIES FROM IN PERSON PRE-TRIAL AND DENYING MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE. SIGNED ON 8/23/22 BY JDG JAMES SHERMAN.

HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

08/24/2022:HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

ORDER SETTING HEARING

08/24/2022:ORDER SETTING HEARING

OBJECTION

08/29/2022:OBJECTION

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOBJECTION; Notes: TO ORDER ON AGREED WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND STIPULATION TO INVOKE THE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE F/B DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • HearingSCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location: MB; Room: 6L (Main Branch); Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING; Notes: CMC- 9/29/22@11AM- VIA ZOOM - JUDGE SHERMAN DTD 8/24/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL; Notes: PLT ATTY PRESENT DFT NO APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER EXCUSING PARTIES FROM IN PERSON PRE-TRIAL AND DENYING MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE. SIGNED ON 8/23/22 BY JDG JAMES SHERMAN.; Notes: EXCUSING PARTIES FROM IN PERSON PRE-TRIAL AND DENYING MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE. SIGNED ON 8/23/22 BY JDG JAMES SHERMAN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIP INVOKING CIVIL PROCEDURE; Notes: AGREED WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND STIPULATION TO INVOKE THE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes: F/B DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO INVOKE F.R.C.P. F/B DFT; Notes: TO INVOKE F.R.C.P. F/B DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR:; Notes: JURY TRIAL F/B DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: AND NOTICE OF DESINATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE F/B DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $65.00; total Amount Paid: $65.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 07/27/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 07/27/2022; Description: 403FF County Civil Claim < $100; Amount Due: $55.00; Amount Paid: $55.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: EFILINGS@PIP-LAWYERS.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 8/24/2022 1:30 PM SHERMAN, JAMES W; Notes: SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 8/24/2022 1:30 PM SHERMAN, JAMES W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $75.00 ON RECEIPT 4552202; Notes: $75.00 4552202 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RF: County Civil Central - RF (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes: F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CERTIFIED SPINE AND PAIN CARE, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gudin, Gregory E, ESQ.