This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 09/29/2022 at 11:37:25 (UTC).

CERTIFIED SPINE AND PAIN CARE LLC A/A/O DARRYL MOORE V PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/26/2022 CERTIFIED SPINE AND PAIN CARE LLC A/A/O DARRYL MOORE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CASTOR , FRANK S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CASTOR , FRANK S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CERTIFIED SPINE AND PAIN CARE LLC A/A/O DARRYL MOORE

Respondent and Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

GUDIN , GREGORY E

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

SAINT-PIERRE , NANCY

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/26/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

07/26/2022:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS REQUESTED

07/26/2022:SUMMONS REQUESTED

PAID $75.00 ON RECEIPT 4551798

07/27/2022:PAID $75.00 ON RECEIPT 4551798

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/27/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4551798

08/04/2022:PAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4551798

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

08/15/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

DEMAND FOR:

09/02/2022:DEMAND FOR:

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

09/02/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

STIP INVOKING CIVIL PROCEDURE

09/02/2022:STIP INVOKING CIVIL PROCEDURE

MOTION TO INVOKE THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE F/B DFT

09/02/2022:MOTION TO INVOKE THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE F/B DFT

ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL

09/06/2022:ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL

HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

09/07/2022:HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

NOTICE OF FILING

09/08/2022:NOTICE OF FILING

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Notes: OBJECTIONS TO ORDER ON AGREED WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND STIPULATION TO INVOKE THE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE F/B DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL; Notes: PARTIES NO APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • HearingSCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location: MB; Room: 4C (Main Branch); Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL; Notes: CALENDAR CALL ON 12/2/22@1:30PM VIA ZOOM-JUDGE CASTOR DTD 9/6/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO INVOKE THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE F/B DFT; Notes: TO INVOKE THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE F/B DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIP INVOKING CIVIL PROCEDURE; Notes: AGREED WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND STIPULATION TO INVOKE THE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: & NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE F/B DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR:; Notes: JURY TRIAL F/B DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY - 08/03/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4551798; Receipt Amount: $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $65.00; total Amount Paid: $65.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 07/27/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 07/27/2022; Description: 403FF County Civil Claim < $100; Amount Due: $55.00; Amount Paid: $55.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: EFILINGS@PIP-LAWYERS.COM E ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 9/6/2022 10:00 AM CASTOR, FRANK S; Notes: SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 9/6/2022 10:00 AM CASTOR, FRANK S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $75.00 ON RECEIPT 4551798; Notes: $75.00 4551798 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RB: County Civil Central - RB (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CERTIFIED SPINE AND PAIN CARE, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gudin, Gregory E, ESQ.