This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 10/31/2019 at 09:56:16 (UTC).

CECCHINI, JAMES V LEGEND GROUP HOLDINGS LLC

Case Summary

On 06/24/2019 CECCHINI, JAMES filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against LEGEND GROUP HOLDINGS LLC. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HAFELE , DONALD W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HAFELE , DONALD W

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

CECCHINI , JAMES

OPPEDISANO , ALBERT

Respondents and Defendants

LINCOLN INVESTMENT CAPITAL HOLDINGS LLC

LEGEND ADVISORY LLC

LEGEND GROUP HOLDINGS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

PICKETT , CHARLES L

HASELKORN ESQ, JASON S

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

BOSTIC , TERRANCE A

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/24/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

06/24/2019:COMPLAINT

PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 3224300

06/26/2019:PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 3224300

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

06/27/2019:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

06/28/2019:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

07/09/2019:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

STIPULATION

08/05/2019:STIPULATION

ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

08/09/2019:ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

EXHIBIT

08/09/2019:EXHIBIT

EXHIBIT

08/09/2019:EXHIBIT

EXHIBIT

08/09/2019:EXHIBIT

MOTION AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW TO DISMISS PLT'S COMPLAINT F/B DFTS

08/09/2019:MOTION AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW TO DISMISS PLT'S COMPLAINT F/B DFTS

NOTICE OF HEARING

10/22/2019:NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

10/28/2019:NOTICE OF HEARING

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Notes:AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING 01/06/2020 01:30:00 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Notes:NOTICE OF HEARING 01/06/2020 01:30:00 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW TO DISMISS PLT'S COMPLAINT F/B DFTS; Notes:AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW TO DISMISS PLT'S COMPLAINT F/B DFTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Notes:"C" FINRA OFFICE OF DISPUTE RESOLUTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Notes:"B" STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Notes:"A" COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES; Notes:DEFENDANT LEGEND GROUP HOLDINGS, LLC, NOTICE OF SERVING RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS' CORRECTED FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION; Notes:JOINT F/B PLTS AND DFTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS' CORRECTED FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO LEGEND GROUP HOLDINGS, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Notes:ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE AND WAIVER OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AS TO LEGEND GROUP HOLDINGS LLC, LINCOLN INVESTMENT CAPITAL HOLDINGS LLC AND LEGEND ADVISORY LLC F/B DFTS ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS' FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO LEGEND GROUP HOLDINGS, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:F/B ATTY TERRANCE A BOSTIC - F/B DFT'S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 3224300; Notes:$401.00 3224300 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AG: Circuit Civil Central - AG (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketReceipt Number:3224300; Receipt Amount: $401.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketTotals: total Amount Due:$401.00; total Amount Paid:$401.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketDue Date:06/26/2019; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less