This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/11/2023 at 19:06:46 (UTC).

CC WEST PALM LLC AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO LUMA AT WEST PALM BEACH LLC DBA COTTONWOOD WEST PALM FKA LUMA WEST PALM V PAIVA, RAFAEL

Case Summary

On 01/30/2023 CC WEST PALM LLC AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO LUMA AT WEST PALM BEACH LLC DBA COTTONWOOD WEST PALM FKA LUMA WEST PALM filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against PAIVA, RAFAEL. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CASTOR , FRANK S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CASTOR , FRANK S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CC WEST PALM LLC AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO LUMA AT WEST PALM BEACH LLC DBA COTTONWOOD WEST PALM FKA LUMA WEST PALM

Respondents and Defendants

NASSER , NABILA

PAIVA , RAFAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SIEGEL , MATTHEW E

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/30/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/30/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/30/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

01/30/2023:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

PAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 4761293

01/31/2023:PAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 4761293

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

02/06/2023:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

02/06/2023:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

02/17/2023:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

AFFIDAVIT

02/17/2023:AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT

02/17/2023:AFFIDAVIT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

02/17/2023:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

02/17/2023:MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/17/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/17/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

CLERK'S DEFAULT

02/23/2023:CLERK'S DEFAULT

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S DEFAULT; Notes: ESERVICE@MGFDLAW.COM RAFAEL PAIVA AKAS PAIVA, RAFAEL A NABILA NASSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: NABILA NASSER 2/3/2023 POSTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RAFAEL PAIVA AKA RAFAEL A PAIVA 2/3/2023 POSTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Notes: DEFAULT F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT; Notes: BY THE CLERK (PROPOSED UNSIGNED CLERKS DEFAULT INCLUDED) F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Notes: VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Notes: VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT; Notes: (SUPPLEMENTAL) RAFAEL PAIVA, NABILA NASSER F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $205.00; total Amount Paid: $205.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/31/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/31/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/31/2023; Description: 401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 4761293; Notes: $205.00 4761293 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RB: County Civil Central - RB (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: eservice@mgfdlaw.com E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: eservice@mgfdlaw.com E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less