This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 11/18/2019 at 19:01:30 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. V MARTIN, KESHIA A

Case Summary

On 10/14/2019 CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MARTIN, KESHIA A. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, North County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CASTOR , FRANK S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-NB

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    North County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CASTOR , FRANK S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A.

Defendant and Respondent

MARTIN , KESHIA A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

RUSSELL , RICHARD A

 

Court Documents

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

11/11/2019:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

11/07/2019:ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 3407122

11/07/2019:PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 3407122

SUMMONS REQUESTED

11/06/2019:SUMMONS REQUESTED

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

10/21/2019:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/16/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 3370043

10/16/2019:PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 3370043

SUMMONS REQUESTED

10/14/2019:SUMMONS REQUESTED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/14/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED; Notes:NON-SERVICE RETURN KESHIA A MARTIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:ESERVICE@ANDREUPALMA.COM E ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • SET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 12/17/2019 9:00 AM CASTOR, JUDGEFRANK S; Notes:SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 12/17/2019 9:00 AM CASTOR, JUDGEFRANK S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • Cancelled SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney on 11/19/2019 9:00:00 AM due to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 3407122; Notes:$10.00 3407122 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED; Notes:NON-SERVICE RETURN KESHIA A MARTIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:ESERVICE@ANDREUPALMA.COM E ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • SET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 11/19/2019 9:00 AM CASTOR, JUDGEFRANK S; Notes:SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 11/19/2019 9:00 AM CASTOR, JUDGEFRANK S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 3370043; Notes:$185.00 3370043 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • Receipt Number:3407122; Receipt Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • Receipt Number:3370043; Receipt Amount: $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$195.00; total Amount Paid:$195.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • Due Date:11/07/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • Due Date:10/16/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • Due Date:10/16/2019; Description:406FF County Civil Claim >$500 < $2500; Amount Due:$175.00; Amount Paid:$175.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location:NB; Room:#1 (North Branch)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • CANCELLED - SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location:NB; Room:#1 (North Branch)

    Read MoreRead Less