This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 07/02/2023 at 01:05:11 (UTC).

BRICKHOUSE INSPECTIONS INC. A/A/O LUDIS M. BUEZO V OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/22/2023 BRICKHOUSE INSPECTIONS INC A/A/O LUDIS M BUEZO filed an Other lawsuit against OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GARRISON , EDWARD A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GARRISON , EDWARD A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

BRICKHOUSE INSPECTIONS INC. A/A/O LUDIS M. BUEZO

Defendant and Respondent

OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

DE ARMAS , FABIOLA

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

GROS-JEAN , MICHELINE

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/22/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER

05/22/2023:DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER

COMPLAINT

05/22/2023:COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

05/22/2023:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

05/22/2023:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

05/22/2023:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

PAID $400.00 ON RECEIPT 4907812

05/23/2023:PAID $400.00 ON RECEIPT 4907812

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/30/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4916744

05/31/2023:PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4916744

NOTICE -NAME/ADDRESS CHANGE

06/09/2023:NOTICE -NAME/ADDRESS CHANGE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

06/15/2023:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

06/26/2023:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO FILE RESPONSE. SIGN BY JUDGE GARRISON 6/28/23

06/28/2023:ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO FILE RESPONSE. SIGN BY JUDGE GARRISON 6/28/23

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO FILE RESPONSE. SIGN BY JUDGE GARRISON 6/28/23; Notes: DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO FILE RESPONSE. SIGN BY JUDGE GARRISON 6/28/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Notes: FB DFT- TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: DESIGNATED EMAIL ADDRESSES; BRESSLER, AMERY & ROSS OBO DFT (F/B MICHELINE GROS-JEAN)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE -NAME/ADDRESS CHANGE; Notes: FIRM ADDRESS F/B M GROSS-JEAN OBO DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4916744; Receipt Amount: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $410.00; total Amount Paid: $410.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/31/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4916744; Notes: $10.00 4916744 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: SERVICE@ILGPA.COM;SERVICE@RESTORATIONLAW.COM EMAILED TO PLTS ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4907812; Receipt Amount: $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/23/2023; Description: 407FF County Civil Claim > $15000 <= $30000; Amount Due: $400.00; Amount Paid: $400.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $400.00 ON RECEIPT 4907812; Notes: $400.00 4907812 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RL: County Civil Central - RL (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes: FIRST/TO DEFENDANT F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: SERVING FIRST SET OF/TO DEFENDANT F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes: F/B ATTY FABIOLA DE ARMAS OBO PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less