This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 08/12/2023 at 19:02:03 (UTC).

ISLAND SHORES APARTMENTS V LEWIS, SHANOVIA

Case Summary

On 07/03/2023 ISLAND SHORES APARTMENTS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against LEWIS, SHANOVIA. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TEW , STEPHANIE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TEW , STEPHANIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

INVESTMENTS LIMITED

ISLAND SHORES APARTMENTS

JHB FLORIDA PROPERTIES LLC

Defendant and Respondent

LEWIS , SHANOVIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

KELLEY , JERRON

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/03/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

07/03/2023:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/03/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4957770

07/05/2023:PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4957770

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

07/10/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

ANSWER

07/14/2023:ANSWER

PAID $0.30 ON RECEIPT 4970155

07/14/2023:PAID $0.30 ON RECEIPT 4970155

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

07/17/2023:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

MOTION TO STRIKE

07/18/2023:MOTION TO STRIKE

DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 34445 PAGE 434-434

07/19/2023:DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 34445 PAGE 434-434

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

07/24/2023:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

SERVICE RETURNED NOT EXECUTED

07/28/2023:SERVICE RETURNED NOT EXECUTED

 

Docket Entries

07/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSERVICE RETURNED NOT EXECUTED; Notes: SHANOVIA LEWIS 7/25/23 RETURNED UNEXECUTED 7/28/23

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED; Notes: FORWARD TO PBSO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023

DocketDISPOSED BY DEFAULT; Notes: DD - DISPOSED BY DEFAULT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 34445 PAGE 434-434; Notes: FOR POSSESSION, AND ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK OF COURT TO CLOSE THE FILE - SIGNED JUDGE TEW 7/19/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION TO STRIKE; Notes: FB PLT- DEFENDANTS PLEADING FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT PURSU?TO FLORIDA STATUTES 8360(2) INTEGRATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Notes

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023

FinancialReceipt Number: 4970155; Receipt Amount: $0.30

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023

FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $195.30; total Amount Paid: $195.30; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023

FinancialDue Date: 07/14/2023; Description: CC County Civil Service Charges PB 01262020; Amount Due: $0.30; Amount Paid: $0.30; Amount Balance: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023

FinancialDue Date: 07/14/2023; Description: CC County Civil Service Charges PB 01262020; Amount Due: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
07/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketANSWER; Notes: F/B DFT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED SHANOVIA LEWIS - 07/08/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023

FinancialReceipt Number: 4957770; Receipt Amount: $195.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023

FinancialDue Date: 07/05/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB 70123 ***; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023

FinancialDue Date: 07/05/2023; Description: 401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4957770; Notes: $195.00 4957770 Fully Paid

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023

DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RJ: County Civil Central - RJ (Civil)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: ESERVICE@KELLEYGRANTLAW.COM E-ISSUED TO ATTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Notes

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

[+] Read More [-] Read Less