This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 06/14/2023 at 19:00:10 (UTC).

WATERWAY VILLAGE APARTMENTS V JEAN BAPTISTE, SANDRA

Case Summary

On 05/05/2023 WATERWAY VILLAGE APARTMENTS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JEAN BAPTISTE, SANDRA. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SHULLMAN , SARAH L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SHULLMAN , SARAH L

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

INVESTMENTS LIMITED

JHB FLORIDA PROPERTIES LLC

WATERWAY VILLAGE APARTMENTS

Respondent and Defendant

JEAN BAPTISTE , SANDRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

KELLEY , JERRON

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/05/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

05/05/2023:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/05/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4888805

05/08/2023:PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4888805

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

05/11/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

05/16/2023:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

05/18/2023:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

05/18/2023:MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

05/18/2023:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

ANSWER

05/19/2023:ANSWER

NOTICE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

05/24/2023:NOTICE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

MOTION TO STRIKE

05/24/2023:MOTION TO STRIKE

DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 34339 PAGE 1607-1607

05/26/2023:DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 34339 PAGE 1607-1607

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

05/31/2023:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

SERVICE RETURNED NOT EXECUTED

06/07/2023:SERVICE RETURNED NOT EXECUTED

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

06/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSERVICE RETURNED NOT EXECUTED; Notes: SANDRA JEAN BAPTISTE 6/2/23 RETURNED UNEXECUTED 6/7/23

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED; Notes: FORWARD TO PBSO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023

DocketDISPOSED BY DEFAULT; Notes: DD - DISPOSED BY DEFAULT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 34339 PAGE 1607-1607; Notes: JUDGE SHULLMAN DTD 5/26/23

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION TO STRIKE; Notes: FB PLT- DFT'S PLEADING AND FOR ENTRY FO DEFAULT PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTES 83. 60 ( 2) AND INTEGRATED MEMO OF LAW

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED; Notes: ESERVICE@KELLEYGRANTLAW.COM SANDRA JEAN BAPTISTE (PLEADING FILED)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketANSWER; Notes: F/B DFT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT; Notes: BY CLERK AGAINST SANDRA JEAN BAPTISTE F/B PLT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Notes: F/B PLT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT; Notes: SANDRA JEAN BAPTISTE F/B PLT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
05/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SUBSTITUTE SANDRA JEAN BAPTISTE - 05/10/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023

FinancialReceipt Number: 4888805; Receipt Amount: $195.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023

FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $195.00; total Amount Paid: $195.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023

FinancialDue Date: 05/08/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023

FinancialDue Date: 05/08/2023; Description: 401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4888805; Notes: $195.00 4888805 Fully Paid

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023

DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RE: County Civil Central - RE (Civil)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: eservice@kelleygrantlaw.com

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Notes: F/B PLT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes: F/B PLT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less