This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 05/27/2023 at 22:41:28 (UTC).

NAVITAS CREDIT CORP V MALOUF, PHILLIPE

Case Summary

On 04/17/2023 NAVITAS CREDIT CORP filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MALOUF, PHILLIPE. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DELGADO , LUIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DELGADO , LUIS

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

NAVITAS CREDIT CORP

Petitioners, Plaintiffs and Cross Plaintiffs

NAVITAS CREDIT CORP

MALOUF , PHILIPPE

Respondents, Defendants and Cross Defendants

GEE , ALONZO

MALOUF , PHILLIPE

NEIL , JASON

3Rd Party Plaintiff, Petitioner and Cross Plaintiff

MALOUF , PHILIPPE

3Rd Party Defendant and Respondent

NEIL , JASON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

ZWIEBEL , ERIC B

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

MARKARIAN , DAVID K

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/17/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

04/17/2023:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/17/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/17/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 4865474

04/18/2023:PAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 4865474

ACCEPTANCE

04/25/2023:ACCEPTANCE

ANSWER & COUNTER PETITION

05/15/2023:ANSWER & COUNTER PETITION

PAID $395.00 ON RECEIPT 4900963

05/17/2023:PAID $395.00 ON RECEIPT 4900963

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/19/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4911830

05/25/2023:PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4911830

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4911830; Receipt Amount: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $826.00; total Amount Paid: $826.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/25/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4911830; Notes: $10.00 4911830 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: dave@forbusinessandlife.com;service@forbusinessandlife.com AS TO THIRD PARTY DFT JASON NEIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4900963; Receipt Amount: $395.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/17/2023; Description: 8CTP CA General Cross Counter 3rd Party PB_070117; Amount Due: $395.00; Amount Paid: $395.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $395.00 ON RECEIPT 4900963; Notes: $395.00 4900963 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & COUNTER PETITION; Notes: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES CROSSCLAIM AND THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT F/B DFT PHILIPPE MALOUF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACCEPTANCE; Notes: ACCEPTANCE AND WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4865474; Receipt Amount: $421.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 04/18/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 04/18/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 04/18/2023; Description: 800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due: $401.00; Amount Paid: $401.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 4865474; Notes: $421.00 4865474 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: AG: Circuit Civil Central - AG (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: eservice@emzwlaw.com;eric.zwiebel@emzwlaw.com;aimee.garner@emzwlaw.com ISSUED TO ALONZO GEE EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: eservice@emzwlaw.com;eric.zwiebel@emzwlaw.com;aimee.garner@emzwlaw.com ISSUED TO PHILLIPPE MALOUF EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less