*********************X-MB
04/17/2023
Pending - Other Pending
Contract - Debt Collection
Palm Beach, Florida
DELGADO , LUIS
NAVITAS CREDIT CORP
NAVITAS CREDIT CORP
MALOUF , PHILIPPE
GEE , ALONZO
MALOUF , PHILLIPE
NEIL , JASON
MALOUF , PHILIPPE
NEIL , JASON
ZWIEBEL , ERIC B
MARKARIAN , DAVID K
04/17/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET
04/17/2023:COMPLAINT
04/17/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED
04/17/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED
04/18/2023:PAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 4865474
04/25/2023:ACCEPTANCE
05/15/2023:ANSWER & COUNTER PETITION
05/17/2023:PAID $395.00 ON RECEIPT 4900963
05/19/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED
05/25/2023:PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4911830
FinancialReceipt Number: 4911830; Receipt Amount: $10.00
[-] Read LessFinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $826.00; total Amount Paid: $826.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00
[-] Read LessFinancialDue Date: 05/25/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00
[-] Read LessDocketPAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4911830; Notes: $10.00 4911830 Fully Paid
[-] Read LessDocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: dave@forbusinessandlife.com;service@forbusinessandlife.com AS TO THIRD PARTY DFT JASON NEIL
[-] Read LessFinancialReceipt Number: 4900963; Receipt Amount: $395.00
[-] Read LessFinancialDue Date: 05/17/2023; Description: 8CTP CA General Cross Counter 3rd Party PB_070117; Amount Due: $395.00; Amount Paid: $395.00; Amount Balance: $0.00
[-] Read LessDocketPAID $395.00 ON RECEIPT 4900963; Notes: $395.00 4900963 Fully Paid
[-] Read LessDocketANSWER & COUNTER PETITION; Notes: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES CROSSCLAIM AND THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT F/B DFT PHILIPPE MALOUF
[-] Read LessDocketACCEPTANCE; Notes: ACCEPTANCE AND WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS OF SUMMONS
[-] Read LessFinancialReceipt Number: 4865474; Receipt Amount: $421.00
[-] Read LessFinancialDue Date: 04/18/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00
[-] Read LessFinancialDue Date: 04/18/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00
[-] Read LessFinancialDue Date: 04/18/2023; Description: 800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due: $401.00; Amount Paid: $401.00; Amount Balance: $0.00
[-] Read LessDocketPAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 4865474; Notes: $421.00 4865474 Fully Paid
[-] Read LessDocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: AG: Circuit Civil Central - AG (Civil)
[-] Read LessDocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: eservice@emzwlaw.com;eric.zwiebel@emzwlaw.com;aimee.garner@emzwlaw.com ISSUED TO ALONZO GEE EFILED
[-] Read LessDocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: eservice@emzwlaw.com;eric.zwiebel@emzwlaw.com;aimee.garner@emzwlaw.com ISSUED TO PHILLIPPE MALOUF EFILED
[-] Read LessDocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: F/B PLT
[-] Read LessDocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes
[-] Read Less