This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 05/21/2023 at 18:07:35 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. V GARCIA, JOSE

Case Summary

On 05/18/2023 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GARCIA, JOSE. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, North County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHENS , DEBRA MOSES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-NB

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

STEPHENS , DEBRA MOSES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.

Defendant and Respondent

GARCIA , JOSE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

PILUIKO , OLEKSANDRA

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/18/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

05/18/2023:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS REQUESTED

05/18/2023:SUMMONS REQUESTED

PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4904044

05/19/2023:PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4904044

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/19/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2023
  • HearingSCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location: NB; Room: #1 (North Branch); Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4904044; Receipt Amount: $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $310.00; total Amount Paid: $310.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/19/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/19/2023; Description: 400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due: $300.00; Amount Paid: $300.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: ESERVICE@ANDREUPALMA.COM E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 6/27/2023 8:45 AM STEPHENS, DEBRA MOSES; Notes: SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 6/27/2023 8:45 AM STEPHENS, DEBRA MOSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4904044; Notes: $310.00 4904044 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RH: North Branch Cty Civ, SC, Evictions - RH (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less