This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 09/13/2023 at 22:42:01 (UTC).

TRAIL PLAZA LLC V R3VIVE LLC

Case Summary

On 08/04/2023 TRAIL PLAZA LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against R3VIVE LLC. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHEESMAN , MAXINE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHEESMAN , MAXINE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

TRAIL PLAZA LLC

Respondents and Defendants

CRACCHIOLO , ANTHONY

R3VIVE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAZAR , JASON M

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/04/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

08/04/2023:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/04/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/04/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 5000463

08/09/2023:PAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 5000463

 

Docket Entries

08/09/2023

FinancialReceipt Number: 5000463; Receipt Amount: $421.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 5000463; Notes: $421.00 5000463 Fully Paid

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023

FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $421.00; total Amount Paid: $421.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023

FinancialDue Date: 08/08/2023; Description: 800FF - Circuit Civil General PB 70123; Amount Due: $401.00; Amount Paid: $401.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023

DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: AJ: Circuit Civil Central - AJ (Civil)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023

FinancialDue Date: 08/08/2023; Description: Summons $10.00; Amount Due: $20.00; Amount Paid: $20.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: JLAZAR@INVESTMENTSLIMITED.COM 20 DAYS AS TO ANTHONY CRACCHIOLO E FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: JLAZAR@INVESTMENTSLIMITED.COM 20 DAY AS TO R3VIVE LLC E FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: F/B PLT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

[+] Read More [-] Read Less