This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 06/27/2023 at 22:42:35 (UTC).

TRUIST BANK SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO SUNTRUST BANK V BLACK, NICOLE

Case Summary

On 05/18/2023 TRUIST BANK SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO SUNTRUST BANK filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against BLACK, NICOLE. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KEYSER , GREGORY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KEYSER , GREGORY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

TRUIST BANK SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO SUNTRUST BANK

Defendants and Respondents

AS TO THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

BLACK , BRIAN M

BLACK , NICOLE

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BROMFIELD , LAUREN A

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

05/18/2023:COMPLAINT

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

06/04/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

06/04/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

06/04/2023:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

06/04/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

06/04/2023:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

PAID $962.60 ON RECEIPT 4906036

05/22/2023:PAID $962.60 ON RECEIPT 4906036

CERTIFICATE

05/18/2023:CERTIFICATE

NOTICE FROM THE COURT REGARDING LAWSUITS TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE ON HOMES F/B PLT

05/18/2023:NOTICE FROM THE COURT REGARDING LAWSUITS TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE ON HOMES F/B PLT

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

05/18/2023:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

NOTICE OF FILING

05/18/2023:NOTICE OF FILING

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/18/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/18/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/18/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/18/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/18/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

05/18/2023:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

LIS PENDENS

05/18/2023:LIS PENDENS

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED BRIAN M BLACK AKA BRIAN BLACK - 05/29/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SUBSTITUTE NICOLE BLACK - 05/29/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED; Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED BEHALF OF SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT - 05/30/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED; Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4906036; Receipt Amount: $962.60

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $962.60; total Amount Paid: $962.60; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/22/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/22/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/22/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Notes: CERTIFICATION OF NOTE POSSESSION F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: e-portalconfirmations@mccalla.com;mrservice@mccalla.com;morgan.lea@mccalla.com AS TO UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2 EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: e-portalconfirmations@mccalla.com;mrservice@mccalla.com;morgan.lea@mccalla.com AS TO UNKNOWN TEANT IN POSSESSION 1 EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: e-portalconfirmations@mccalla.com;mrservice@mccalla.com;morgan.lea@mccalla.com AS TO THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: e-portalconfirmations@mccalla.com;mrservice@mccalla.com;morgan.lea@mccalla.com AS TO BRIAN M BLACK AKA BRIAN BLACK EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: e-portalconfirmations@mccalla.com;mrservice@mccalla.com;morgan.lea@mccalla.com AS TO NICOLE BLACK EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS BOOK 34326 PAGE 463-463; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: VERIFIED TO FORECLOSURE MORTGAGE F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less