This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 06/30/2023 at 15:05:22 (UTC).

SAPPHIRE BELLE LLC V DOTTIN, LATERIA

Case Summary

On 05/31/2023 SAPPHIRE BELLE LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DOTTIN, LATERIA. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, West County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALIJEWICZ , SARA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-WB

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALIJEWICZ , SARA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SAPPHIRE BELLE LLC

Respondent and Defendant

DOTTIN , LATERIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

KOWAL , BRIAN P

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/31/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

05/31/2023:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4917103

05/31/2023:PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4917103

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/31/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $12.50 ON RECEIPT 4918262

06/01/2023:PAID $12.50 ON RECEIPT 4918262

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

06/12/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

06/22/2023:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED LATERIA DOTTIN - 06/02/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4918262; Receipt Amount: $12.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $197.50; total Amount Paid: $197.50; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 06/01/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 06/01/2023; Description: 4XDT Additional DFT over 5: $2.50; Amount Due: $2.50; Amount Paid: $2.50; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $12.50 ON RECEIPT 4918262; Notes: $12.50 4918262 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4917103; Receipt Amount: $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/31/2023; Description: 401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: bpkowal@gmail.com;filings.briankowal@gmail.com EMAILED TO PLTS ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4917103; Notes: $185.00 4917103 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RA: West Branch Cty Civ, SC, Evictions - RA (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less