This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 06/07/2023 at 19:02:22 (UTC).

2018-3 IH BORROWER LP WITH GP 2018-3 IH BORROWER GP LLC V GOUR-PARRY, MAUREEN

Case Summary

On 04/28/2023 2018-3 IH BORROWER LP WITH GP 2018-3 IH BORROWER GP LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GOUR-PARRY, MAUREEN. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SILVER , ORI. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SILVER , ORI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

2018-3 IH BORROWER LP WITH GP 2018-3 IH BORROWER GP LLC

Defendants and Respondents

BRODERICK , CECIL

GOUR-PARRY , MAUREEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LOWENHAUPT , KENNETH J

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/28/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/28/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/28/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

04/28/2023:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

PAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 4879976

05/01/2023:PAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 4879976

MOTION FOR ORDER

05/04/2023:MOTION FOR ORDER

STIPULATION

05/04/2023:STIPULATION

ORDER OF DISMISSAL

05/05/2023:ORDER OF DISMISSAL

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

05/10/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

05/10/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

05/16/2023:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

05/16/2023:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE VERIFIED SUBSTITUTE MAUREEN GOUR-PARRY - 05/05/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE VERIFIED SUBSTITUTE CECIL BRODERICK - 05/05/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketDISMISSED BEFORE HEARING; Notes: DB - DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 34291 PAGE 710-710; Notes: AND ORDER APPROVING SITP-JUDGE SILVER DTD 5/5/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION; Notes: PARTIES STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ORDER; Notes: APPROVING STIPULATION & DISMISSAL F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4879976; Receipt Amount: $205.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $205.00; total Amount Paid: $205.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/01/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/01/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/01/2023; Description: 401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 4879976; Notes: $205.00 4879976 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RS: South Branch County Civil Division - RS (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: pleadings@fl-landlord.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: pleadings@fl-landlord.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less