This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 08/31/2023 at 19:50:26 (UTC).

LOPEZ, ANIA GUEVARA V UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/01/2023 LOPEZ, ANIA GUEVARA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GOODMAN , JAIMIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GOODMAN , JAIMIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

LOPEZ , ANIA GUEVARA

Respondent and Defendant

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

DE LA OSA , EDWARD

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

BADGER , ROYCE B

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/01/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

08/01/2023:COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

08/01/2023:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

08/01/2023:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

08/01/2023:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 4991398

08/02/2023:PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 4991398

DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER

08/15/2023:DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/15/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 5008067

08/16/2023:PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 5008067

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

08/21/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

08/21/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

08/25/2023:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

08/25/2023:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

08/25/2023:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

08/25/2023:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES 115394

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes: DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes: DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: DEFENDANT'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: ON 08/17/2023 - UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY - F/B PLT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY - 08/17/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023

FinancialReceipt Number: 5008067; Receipt Amount: $10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023

FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $411.00; total Amount Paid: $411.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023

FinancialDue Date: 08/16/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS - Circuit Civil CA; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 5008067; Notes: $10.00 5008067 Fully Paid

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
08/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER; Notes: F/B PLT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2023

FinancialReceipt Number: 4991398; Receipt Amount: $401.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2023

FinancialDue Date: 08/02/2023; Description: 800FF - Circuit Civil General PB 70123; Amount Due: $401.00; Amount Paid: $401.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 4991398; Notes: $401.00 4991398 Fully Paid

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2023

DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: AD: Circuit Civil Central - AD (Civil)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES F/B PLT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes: FIRST OF DOCUMENTS F/B PLT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Notes: DUCES TECUM DFT CR DTD TBD F/B ATTY DE LA OSA OBO PLT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: F/B PLT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

[+] Read More [-] Read Less